This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/04/2021 at 09:28:08 (UTC).

XPO Logistics Cartage LLC vs California Unemployment Insurance Appeals Board

Case Summary

On 05/19/2021 XPO Logistics Cartage LLC filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against California Unemployment Insurance Appeals Board. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Katherine Bacal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Katherine Bacal

 

Party Details

Petitioners

XPO Logistics Cartage LLC

XPO Logistics Inc

Respondents

California Employment Development Department

California Unemployment Insurance Appeals Board

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CARP, DYLAN B

Attorney at JACKSON LEWIS PC

50 California Street 9Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Respondent Attorney

Barsegyan, Anna

300 South Spring Street 1702

Los Angeles, CA 90013

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Cover Sheets)

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by XPO Logistics Cartage LLC; XPO Logistics Inc. Refers to: California Unemployment Insurance Appeals Board; California Employment Development Department

Petition - Other (Case Initiation)

Petition for Writ of Mandate filed by XPO Logistics Cartage LLC; XPO Logistics Inc. Refers to: California Unemployment Insurance Appeals Board; California Employment Development Department; Ruiz, Ruben

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed by XPO Logistics Cartage LLC. Refers to: California Employment Development Department

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed by XPO Logistics Cartage LLC. Refers to: California Unemployment Insurance Appeals Board

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed by XPO Logistics Cartage LLC. Refers to: Ruiz, Ruben

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Ruiz, Ruben Aldrete.

Notice of Appearance

Notice of Appearance filed by Ruiz, Ruben Aldrete.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Answer

Answer filed by California Unemployment Insurance Appeals Board; California Employment Development Department.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-69; Event Type: OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • DocketOSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed scheduled for 04/08/2022 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by California Unemployment Insurance Appeals Board; California Employment Development Department. Filed By: California Unemployment Insurance Appeals Board (Respondent); California Employment Development Department (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Petition filed by XPO Logistics Cartage LLC. Refers to: Ruiz, Ruben Filed By: XPO Logistics Cartage LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Petition filed by XPO Logistics Cartage LLC. Refers to: California Unemployment Insurance Appeals Board Filed By: XPO Logistics Cartage LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Petition filed by XPO Logistics Cartage LLC. Refers to: California Employment Development Department Filed By: XPO Logistics Cartage LLC (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Appearance filed by Ruiz, Ruben Aldrete. Filed By: Ruiz, Ruben Aldrete (Interested Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Ruiz, Ruben Aldrete. Filed By: Ruiz, Ruben Aldrete (Interested Party)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition for Writ of Mandate filed by XPO Logistics Cartage LLC; XPO Logistics Inc. Refers to: California Unemployment Insurance Appeals Board; California Employment Development Department; Ruiz, Ruben Filed By: XPO Logistics Cartage LLC (Petitioner); XPO Logistics Inc (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by XPO Logistics Cartage LLC; XPO Logistics Inc. Refers to: California Unemployment Insurance Appeals Board; California Employment Development Department; Ruiz, Ruben Filed By: XPO Logistics Cartage LLC (Petitioner); XPO Logistics Inc (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by XPO Logistics Cartage LLC; XPO Logistics Inc. Refers to: California Unemployment Insurance Appeals Board; California Employment Development Department Filed By: XPO Logistics Cartage LLC (Petitioner); XPO Logistics Inc (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Bacal, Katherine.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where XPO LOGISTICS CARTAGE LLC DBA XPO LOGISTICS is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA UNEMPLOYMENT INSURANCE APPEALS BOARD is a litigant

Latest cases where XPO Logistics, Inc. is a litigant