Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/05/2020 at 01:30:59 (UTC).

WTR LLC vs MERICLE

Case Summary

On 08/02/2019 WTR LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MERICLE. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald L. Styn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ronald L. Styn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WTR LLC

Defendants

Synder, John J; DBA : LEGACY BREWING TAP AND KITCHEN

Mericle, Mark ; DBA : LEGACY BREWING TAP AND KITCHEN

Mericle, Mark

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jacobs, Jeffrey G

Defendant Attorney

Beckstrand, Dwight

 

Court Documents

General Denial

General Denial filed by Mericle, Mark.

General Denial

[Another document for ROA# 10]

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Amended General Denial

General Denial (Amended) filed by Mericle, Mark.

Complaint

Complaint filed by WTR LLC. Refers to: Synder, John; Mericle, Mark

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by WTR LLC. Refers to: Synder, John; Mericle, Mark

Summons

Original Summons filed by WTR LLC. Refers to: Synder, John; Mericle, Mark

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Denial (Amended) filed by Mericle, Mark. Filed By: Mericle, Mark (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 10]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Denial filed by Mericle, Mark. Filed By: Mericle, Mark (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/03/2020 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-74 Ronald L. Styn.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Styn, Ronald.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by WTR LLC. Refers to: Synder, John; Mericle, Mark Filed By: WTR LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by WTR LLC. Refers to: Synder, John; Mericle, Mark Filed By: WTR LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by WTR LLC. Refers to: Synder, John; Mericle, Mark; Mericle, Mark Filed By: WTR LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer JACOBS JEFFREY GEORGE