This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/30/2021 at 03:23:31 (UTC).

WORLEY vs SHEMRAN INC

Case Summary

On 01/28/2021 WORLEY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SHEMRAN INC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Carolyn Caietti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Carolyn Caietti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Worley, Marc

Defendant

Shemran Inc; DBA : Barons Market

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Laureti, Anthony R

402 West Broadway 2600

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Worley, Marc. Refers to: Shemran Inc

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Worley, Marc. Refers to: Shemran Inc

Complaint

Complaint filed by Worley, Marc. Refers to: Shemran Inc

Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint (FIRST AMENDED) filed by Worley, Marc. Refers to: Shemran Inc

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 11/12/2021 09:30:00 AM.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Worley, Marc.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 08/13/2021 09:15:00 AM.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Worley, Marc.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-70; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint (FIRST AMENDED) filed by Worley, Marc. Refers to: Shemran Inc Filed By: Worley, Marc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference continued pursuant to Court's motion to 01/14/2022 at 01:30PM before Judge Carolyn Caietti.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 11/12/2021 09:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Worley, Marc. Filed By: Worley, Marc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference continued pursuant to party's motion to 11/12/2021 at 09:30AM before Judge Carolyn Caietti.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 08/13/2021 09:15:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Worley, Marc. Filed By: Worley, Marc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/13/2021 at 09:15:00 AM at Central in C-70 Carolyn Caietti.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Worley, Marc. Refers to: Shemran Inc Filed By: Worley, Marc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Worley, Marc. Refers to: Shemran Inc Filed By: Worley, Marc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Worley, Marc. Refers to: Shemran Inc Filed By: Worley, Marc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Caietti, Carolyn.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SHEMRAN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laureti, Anthony R