This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/24/2022 at 08:04:28 (UTC).

WLCCO Inc VS Stepanian

Case Summary

On 11/12/2019 WLCCO Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Stepanian. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald F. Frazier. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ronald F. Frazier

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WLCCO Inc

Defendant

Stepanian, James ; DBA : ESSASSIN.COM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Austin, Gina M

3990 Old Town Avenue A 112

San Diego, CA 92110

Craft, Tamara M

Attorney at AUSTIN LEGAL GROUP APC

3990 Old Town Avenue A 101

San Diego, CA 92110

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by WLCCO Inc. Refers to: Stepanian, James

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by WLCCO Inc. Refers to: Stepanian, James

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by WLCCO Inc. Refers to: Stepanian, James

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by WLCCO Inc.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by WLCCO Inc; WLCCO Inc.

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by WLCCO Inc.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by WLCCO Inc. Filed By: WLCCO Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by WLCCO Inc; WLCCO Inc. Filed By: WLCCO Inc (Plaintiff); WLCCO Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed with prejudice as to Stepanian, James .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed with prejudice as to WLCCO Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/01/2020 at 11:00:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by WLCCO Inc. Filed By: WLCCO Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/01/2020 at 11:00:00 AM at Central in C-65 Ronald F. Frazier.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by WLCCO Inc. Refers to: Stepanian, James Filed By: WLCCO Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by WLCCO Inc. Refers to: Stepanian, James Filed By: WLCCO Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by WLCCO Inc. Refers to: Stepanian, James Filed By: WLCCO Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Frazier, Ronald.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less