This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/10/2023 at 05:31:21 (UTC).

Witt vs Allen

Case Summary

On 03/23/2022 Witt filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Allen. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Blaine K. Bowman. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************A-NC

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Blaine K. Bowman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Witt, Melanie

Defendant

Allen, Zachary

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wallenstein, Robert L

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Witt, Melanie. Refers to: Allen, Zachary

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Witt, Melanie. Refers to: Allen, Zachary

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Witt, Melanie. Refers to: Allen, Zachary

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 10/07/2022 at 09:00:00 AM in N-31 before Blaine K. Bowman at North County.

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Witt, Melanie. Refers to: Allen, Zachary

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/07/2022 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-31 Blaine K. Bowman was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Witt, Melanie .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Allen, Zachary .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Witt, Melanie. Refers to: Allen, Zachary; Filed By: Witt, Melanie (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/07/2022 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-31 Blaine K. Bowman.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 10/07/2022 at 09:00:00 AM in N-31 before Blaine K. Bowman at North County.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/02/2022 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-31 Blaine K. Bowman.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Bowman, Blaine.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Witt, Melanie. Refers to: Allen, Zachary; Filed By: Witt, Melanie (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Witt, Melanie. Refers to: Allen, Zachary; Filed By: Witt, Melanie (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Witt, Melanie. Refers to: Allen, Zachary; Filed By: Witt, Melanie (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less