This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/05/2021 at 03:36:53 (UTC).

Wirthkrchner vs State of California

Case Summary

On 06/09/2021 Wirthkrchner filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against State of California. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Keri Katz. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Keri Katz

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wirthkirchner, Corinna

Defendants

Abbott, Lucas

Kattke, Brian

Parker, Shawn

Peck, Jonathan

Phoenix, Tuchon

State Of California

County of San Diego

State Of California by and through the California Highway Patrol; ESA : State Of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Savary, Scott

110 Plaza, 110 W A St

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorneys

Welsh, Christopher J

Attorney at COUNTY COUNSEL

1600 Pacific Highway 355

San Diego, CA 92101-2469

Freund, Lisa L

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

600 W Broadway 1800

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Defendant County of San Diego's Answer to Complaint

Answer filed by County of San Diego.

Defendant County of San Diego's Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by County of San Diego.

Demurrer

Demurrer filed by State Of California by and through the California Highway Patrol.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by State Of California by and through the California Highway Patrol.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (of Lisa L. Freund) filed by State Of California by and through the California Highway Patrol.

of Lisa L. Freund Regarding Demurrer Meet and Confer Efforts

Declaration - Other filed by State Of California by and through the California Highway Patrol.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Wirthkirchner, Corinna.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Wirthkirchner, Corinna.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Wirthkirchner, Corinna.

Peremptory Challenge

Peremptory Challenge (Granted) filed by Wirthkirchner, Corinna.

Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (DOE 1) filed by Wirthkirchner, Corinna. Refers to: Parker, Shawn; Kattke, Brian; Abbott, Lucas; Phoenix, Tuchon; Peck, Jonathan; State Of California; County of San Diego

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 12]

Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/07/2022 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-74 Keri Katz.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Wirthkirchner, Corinna. Refers to: State Of California; Abbott, Lucas; Parker, Shawn; Phoenix, Tuchon; Kattke, Brian; Peck, Jonathan

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wirthkirchner, Corinna. Refers to: State Of California; Abbott, Lucas; Parker, Shawn; Phoenix, Tuchon; Kattke, Brian; Peck, Jonathan

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-74; Event Type: Demurrer / Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-74; Event Type: Motion Hearing (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-74; Event Type: Demurrer / Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-74; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketDemurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 03/11/2022 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-74 Keri Katz.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed by State Of California by and through the California Highway Patrol. Filed By: State Of California by and through the California Highway Patrol (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketDemurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 01/07/2022 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-74 Keri Katz.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) scheduled for 01/07/2022 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-74 Keri Katz.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketThe Demurrer / Motion to Strike was rescheduled to 02/10/2022 at 08:30:00 AM in C-74 before Keri Katz at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketDemurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 02/10/2022 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-74 Keri Katz.

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from Judge Meyer, John S. to Keri Katz effective 06/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/14/2022 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPeremptory Challenge (Granted) filed by Wirthkirchner, Corinna. Filed By: Wirthkirchner, Corinna (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Wirthkirchner, Corinna. Refers to: State Of California by and through the California Highway Patrol; Abbott, Lucas; Parker, Shawn; Phoenix, Tuchon; Kattke, Brian; Peck, Jonathan; County of San Diego Filed By: Wirthkirchner, Corinna (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wirthkirchner, Corinna. Refers to: State Of California by and through the California Highway Patrol; Abbott, Lucas; Parker, Shawn; Phoenix, Tuchon; Kattke, Brian; Peck, Jonathan Filed By: Wirthkirchner, Corinna (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Meyer, John.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lisa Lewis Freund

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Welsh, Christopher J