This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/05/2021 at 10:09:41 (UTC).

Windy Cove Inc vs Circle K Stores Inc

Case Summary

On 07/12/2021 Windy Cove Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Circle K Stores Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is John S. Meyer. The case status is Other - Transferred.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

John S. Meyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AAA Able Inc; DBA : University City Mobil and South Bay

Diamond Bar Petroleum Inc; DBA : Diamond Bar Mobil

Newkirks Santa Fe Service Inc

Oceanside Akam Oil Inc

S & G Zavaro Inc; DBA : Miramar Mobil

S & Z Petroleum Inc; DBA : Haven Mobil

Staffing and Management Group Inc; DBA : Kazmo LLC

Windy Cove Inc

Defendant

Circle K Stores Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Cohen, Stuart E

Kanooni, Kevin Y

Roberts, Kenneth P

Tish, Ryan Paul

 

Court Documents

Complaint (Case Initiation)

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Cover Sheets)

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 5]

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Cover Sheets)

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Windy Cove Inc; AAA Able Inc; S & G Zavaro Inc; Newkirks Santa Fe Service Inc; Diamond Bar Petroleum Inc; S & Z Petroleum Inc; Oceanside Akam Oil Inc; Staffing and Management Group Inc. Refers to: Circle K Stores Inc

Complaint (Case Initiation)

Complaint filed by Windy Cove Inc; AAA Able Inc; S & G Zavaro Inc; Newkirks Santa Fe Service Inc; Diamond Bar Petroleum Inc; S & Z Petroleum Inc; Oceanside Akam Oil Inc; Staffing and Management Group Inc. Refers to: Circle K Stores Inc

Case Management Statement (Case Management)

Original Summons filed by Windy Cove Inc; AAA Able Inc; S & G Zavaro Inc; Newkirks Santa Fe Service Inc; Diamond Bar Petroleum Inc; S & Z Petroleum Inc; Oceanside Akam Oil Inc; Staffing and Management Group Inc.

Peremptory Challenge (Challenge)

Peremptory Challenge filed by Windy Cove Inc; AAA Able Inc; S & G Zavaro Inc; Newkirks Santa Fe Service Inc; Diamond Bar Petroleum Inc; S & Z Petroleum Inc; Oceanside Akam Oil Inc; Staffing and Management Group Inc.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Judge Bacal, Katherine to John Meyer effective 07/27/2021

Notice - Other (Notices)

Notice - Other (OF (1) ORDER ON PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE AND (2) NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT) filed by AAA Able Inc; Diamond Bar Petroleum Inc; Newkirks Santa Fe Service Inc; Oceanside Akam Oil Inc; S & G Zavaro Inc; S & Z Petroleum Inc; Staffing and Management Group Inc; Windy Cove Inc.

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service filed by Circle K Stores Inc.

Notice of Removal to Federal Court (Stays)

Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed by Circle K Stores Inc.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/10/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNotice - Other (OF (1) ORDER ON PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE AND (2) NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT) filed by AAA Able Inc; Diamond Bar Petroleum Inc; Newkirks Santa Fe Service Inc; Oceanside Akam Oil Inc; S & G Zavaro Inc; S & Z Petroleum Inc; Staffing and Management Group Inc; Windy Cove Inc. Filed By: AAA Able Inc (Plaintiff); Diamond Bar Petroleum Inc (Plaintiff); Newkirks Santa Fe Service Inc (Plaintiff); Oceanside Akam Oil Inc (Plaintiff); S & G Zavaro Inc (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2021
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court filed by Circle K Stores Inc. Filed By: Circle K Stores Inc (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2021
View Court Documents

DocketProof of Service filed by Circle K Stores Inc. Filed By: Circle K Stores Inc (Defendant)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCase reassigned from Judge Bacal, Katherine to John Meyer effective 07/27/2021

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/26/2021

DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/17/2021 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal was vacated.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/21/2021
View Court Documents

DocketPeremptory Challenge filed by Windy Cove Inc; AAA Able Inc; S & G Zavaro Inc; Newkirks Santa Fe Service Inc; Diamond Bar Petroleum Inc; S & Z Petroleum Inc; Oceanside Akam Oil Inc; Staffing and Management Group Inc. Filed By: Windy Cove Inc (Plaintiff); AAA Able Inc (Plaintiff); S & G Zavaro Inc (Plaintiff); Newkirks Santa Fe Service Inc (Plaintiff); Diamond Bar Petroleum Inc (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2021
View Court Documents

DocketOriginal Summons filed by Windy Cove Inc; AAA Able Inc; S & G Zavaro Inc; Newkirks Santa Fe Service Inc; Diamond Bar Petroleum Inc; S & Z Petroleum Inc; Oceanside Akam Oil Inc; Staffing and Management Group Inc. Filed By: Windy Cove Inc (Plaintiff); AAA Able Inc (Plaintiff); S & G Zavaro Inc (Plaintiff); Newkirks Santa Fe Service Inc (Plaintiff); Diamond Bar Petroleum Inc (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2021

DocketSummons issued.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2021

DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/17/2021 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-69 Katherine Bacal.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCase initiation form printed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2021
View Court Documents

Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2021
View Court Documents

Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/13/2021
View Court Documents

DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2021
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint filed by Windy Cove Inc; AAA Able Inc; S & G Zavaro Inc; Newkirks Santa Fe Service Inc; Diamond Bar Petroleum Inc; S & Z Petroleum Inc; Oceanside Akam Oil Inc; Staffing and Management Group Inc. Refers to: Circle K Stores Inc Filed By: Windy Cove Inc (Plaintiff); AAA Able Inc (Plaintiff); S & G Zavaro Inc (Plaintiff); Newkirks Santa Fe Service Inc (Plaintiff); Diamond Bar Petroleum Inc (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2021
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Windy Cove Inc; AAA Able Inc; S & G Zavaro Inc; Newkirks Santa Fe Service Inc; Diamond Bar Petroleum Inc; S & Z Petroleum Inc; Oceanside Akam Oil Inc; Staffing and Management Group Inc. Refers to: Circle K Stores Inc Filed By: Windy Cove Inc (Plaintiff); AAA Able Inc (Plaintiff); S & G Zavaro Inc (Plaintiff); Newkirks Santa Fe Service Inc (Plaintiff); Diamond Bar Petroleum Inc (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2021

DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Bacal, Katherine.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less