This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/29/2021 at 03:05:12 (UTC).

Wimberley vs. Wal-Mart Stores Inc

Case Summary

On 12/11/2020 Wimberley filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Wal-Mart Stores Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Blaine K. Bowman. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************P-NC

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Blaine K. Bowman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wimberley, Evelyn

Defendants

Wal-Mart Stores Inc

AG Industrial Supply

Hearthmark LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

URE, STEPHEN

11622 El Camino Real Suite 100

San Diego, CA 92130

 

Court Documents

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Wimberley, Evelyn.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wimberley, Evelyn.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Wimberley, Evelyn. Refers to: Wal-Mart Stores Inc; Heartmark LLC; AG Industrial Supply

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Wimberley, Evelyn. Refers to: Heartmark LLC

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Wimberley, Evelyn. Refers to: AG Industrial Supply

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Wimberley, Evelyn. Refers to: Wal-Mart Stores Inc

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Casserly,Timothy to Bowman,Blaine effective 05/01/2021

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Wimberley, Evelyn. Refers to: Wal-Mart Stores Inc

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Wimberley, Evelyn. Refers to: Wal-Mart Stores Inc; Hearthmark LLC; AG Industrial Supply

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 05/28/2021 09:00:00 AM.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Wimberley, Evelyn.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/27/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-31 Blaine K. Bowman was vacated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Wal-Mart Stores Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Hearthmark LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to AG Industrial Supply.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Wimberley, Evelyn .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Wimberley, Evelyn. Refers to: Wal-Mart Stores Inc; Hearthmark LLC; AG Industrial Supply Filed By: Wimberley, Evelyn (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference continued pursuant to Court's motion to 08/27/2021 at 09:00AM before Judge Blaine K. Bowman.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 05/28/2021 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Wimberley, Evelyn. Filed By: Wimberley, Evelyn (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference reassigned to Bowman, Blaine for 05/28/2021 at 09:00:00 AM in N-31 at North County.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Wimberley, Evelyn. Refers to: Wal-Mart Stores Inc Filed By: Wimberley, Evelyn (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Wimberley, Evelyn. Refers to: AG Industrial Supply Filed By: Wimberley, Evelyn (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Wimberley, Evelyn. Refers to: Heartmark LLC Filed By: Wimberley, Evelyn (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/28/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Wimberley, Evelyn. Refers to: Wal-Mart Stores Inc; Hearthmark LLC; AG Industrial Supply Filed By: Wimberley, Evelyn (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wimberley, Evelyn. Filed By: Wimberley, Evelyn (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Wimberley, Evelyn. Filed By: Wimberley, Evelyn (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Casserly, Timothy.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less