This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/07/2021 at 06:11:28 (UTC).

Wimberley vs Wagner Spraytech Corporation

Case Summary

On 09/27/2021 Wimberley filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Wagner Spraytech Corporation. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is John S. Meyer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

John S. Meyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wimberley, Evelyn

Defendants

Wagner Spraytech Corporation

Wayfair LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

URE, STEPHEN

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF STEPHEN URE PC

11452-11682, El Camino Real

San Diego, CA 92130

Defendant Attorney

Ledger, Brian M

Attorney at GORDON & REES LLP

101 W Broadway 2000

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Wimberley, Evelyn. Refers to: Wagner Spraytech Corporation; Wayfair LLC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wimberley, Evelyn. Refers to: Wagner Spraytech Corporation; Wayfair LLC

Complaint

Complaint filed by Wimberley, Evelyn. Refers to: Wagner Spraytech Corporation; Wayfair LLC

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Wimberley, Evelyn. Refers to: Wagner Spraytech Corporation

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Wagner Spraytech Corporation; Wayfair LLC.

Defendants Wagner Spraytech Corporation and Wayfair LLC's Answer to Complaint

Answer filed by Wagner Spraytech Corporation; Wayfair LLC.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-64; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Wimberley, Evelyn. Refers to: Wagner Spraytech Corporation Filed By: Wimberley, Evelyn (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Wagner Spraytech Corporation; Wayfair LLC. Filed By: Wagner Spraytech Corporation (Defendant); Wayfair LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Wagner Spraytech Corporation; Wayfair LLC. Filed By: Wagner Spraytech Corporation (Defendant); Wayfair LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/08/2022 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-64 John S. Meyer.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Wimberley, Evelyn. Refers to: Wagner Spraytech Corporation; Wayfair LLC Filed By: Wimberley, Evelyn (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wimberley, Evelyn. Refers to: Wagner Spraytech Corporation; Wayfair LLC Filed By: Wimberley, Evelyn (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Wimberley, Evelyn. Refers to: Wagner Spraytech Corporation; Wayfair LLC Filed By: Wimberley, Evelyn (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Meyer, John.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less