This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 08:47:10 (UTC).

Wilson vs DeMarino

Case Summary

On 12/27/2016 Wilson filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against DeMarino. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GREGORY W POLLACK. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    12/27/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

GREGORY W POLLACK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILSON, MATTILIE

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

BERT & BOB INVESTMENT CO

DARKSIDE FITNESS LLC

PLATINUM STAGES

MARTIN, LAURA E

DEMARINO, ANDREA

HILL STREET PLAZA INC; ESA : DOE 11

JWC CONSTRUCTION INC; DBA : JON WAYNE CONSTRUCTION AND CONSULTING

GARCIA, RUDY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CROSS, OLEG

6363 Greenwich 140

San Diego, CA 92122

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

MENDES, PATRICK

Attorney at TYSON & MENDES LLP

5661 La Jolla Blvd

La Jolla, CA 92037

FARKAS, RICHARD D

15300 Ventura Blvd Suite 504

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

BITTERLIN, DANE J

1010 Second 2500

San Diego, CA 92101

REISNER, AARON H

5720 Oberlin Dr

San Diego, CA 92121

 

Court Documents

Answer

Answer filed by Platinum Stages.

Answer

Answer filed by DeMarino, Andrea; Darkside Fitness LLC.

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by DeMarino, Andrea; Darkside Fitness LLC. Refers to: Platinum Stages; Martin, Laura

Original Summons

Original Summons (Cross Complaint) filed by DeMarino, Andrea; Darkside Fitness LLC. Refers to: Platinum Stages; Martin, Laura

Answer

Answer filed by Martin, Laura E.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by Wilson, Mattilie. Refers to: Bert & Bob Investment Co

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 15]

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Defendant Laura E. Martin's First Amended Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint

Amended Answer filed by Martin, Laura E.

Answer

Answer filed by Hill Street Plaza Inc.

Original Summons

Original Summons (Cross Complaint) filed by Hill Street Plaza Inc. Refers to: Darkside Fitness LLC

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by Hill Street Plaza Inc. Refers to: Darkside Fitness LLC

Answer

Answer (W/Proof of Service) filed by Platinum Stages.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Platinum Stages.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Hill Street Plaza Inc.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by DeMarino, Andrea; Darkside Fitness LLC.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by DeMarino, Andrea; Darkside Fitness LLC.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by DeMarino, Andrea; Darkside Fitness LLC.

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Wilson, Mattilie .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Hill Street Plaza Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Platinum Stages.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Martin, Laura E .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Bert & Bob Investment Co.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to Darkside Fitness LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to DeMarino, Andrea .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Wilson, Mattilie. Filed By: Wilson, Mattilie (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketCross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Platinum Stages.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • DocketCross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Hill Street Plaza Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
86 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/02/2017 at 01:00:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Pollack, Gregory.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Wilson, Mattilie. Refers to: DeMarino, Andrea; Darkside Fitness LLC; Bert & Bob Investment Co; Martin, Laura; Platinum Stages Filed By: Wilson, Mattilie (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 3]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wilson, Mattilie. Refers to: DeMarino, Andrea; Darkside Fitness LLC; Bert & Bob Investment Co; Martin, Laura; Platinum Stages Filed By: Wilson, Mattilie (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 2]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • DocketComplaint filed by Wilson, Mattilie. Refers to: DeMarino, Andrea; Darkside Fitness LLC; Bert & Bob Investment Co; Martin, Laura; Platinum Stages; Hill Street Plaza Inc Filed By: Wilson, Mattilie (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[A document for ROA# 1]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JWC CONSTRUCTION INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cross, Oleg