This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/06/2022 at 08:08:16 (UTC).

WILSHIRE LAW FIRM PLC vs PEAK DIAGNOSTIC LLC

Case Summary

On 08/08/2022 WILSHIRE LAW FIRM PLC filed an Other lawsuit against PEAK DIAGNOSTIC LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew C. Braner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Matthew C. Braner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILSHIRE LAW FIRM PLC

Cross Defendants and Defendants

CRUZ-HONORATO, GERADO

WANG, MICHAEL

PEAK DIAGNOSTIC PC; ESA : PEAK DIAGNOSTIC LLC

Cross Plaintiff

PEAK DIAGNOSTIC LLC; ESA : PEAK DIAGNOSTIC LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant, Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Saadian, Bobby

3055 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Bobroff, Seth B

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICES OF SETH B BOBROFF

9888 Carroll Centre Rd Ste 222

San Diego, CA 92126

 

Court Documents

Separate Statement

Separate Statement filed by CRUZ-HONORATO, GERADO.

HRG 12/2/22 Motion to Compel Discovery

Motion to Compel Discovery filed by CRUZ-HONORATO, GERADO.

Tentative Rulings

Tentative Ruling for Demurrer / Motion to Strike published.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by PEAK DIAGNOSTIC PC.

Declaration of Seth Bobroff in Support of Opposition to Motion to Strike

Declaration - Other (SETH BOBROFF) filed by PEAK DIAGNOSTIC PC.

Opposition to Cross-Defendants MTS

Opposition - Other filed by PEAK DIAGNOSTIC PC.

Summons Cross-Complaint

Original Summons filed by PEAK DIAGNOSTIC PC.

HRG 11/4/22 Motion to Strike

Motion to Strike filed by CRUZ-HONORATO, GERADO.

HRG 11/4/22 Request for Judicial Notice

Request for Judicial Notice filed by WILSHIRE LAW FIRM PLC.

Motion for Reclassification

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 15]

Cross-Complaint

[Another document for ROA# 15]

Answer

[Another document for ROA# 15]

Motion for Reclassification

Motion - Other filed by PEAK DIAGNOSTIC LLC.

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by PEAK DIAGNOSTIC LLC. Refers to: CRUZ-HONORATO, GERADO

Answer

Answer filed by PEAK DIAGNOSTIC LLC.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by WILSHIRE LAW FIRM PLC. Refers to: PEAK DIAGNOSTIC LLC

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-60; Event Type: Motion Hearing (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-60; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint in Interpleader

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-60; Event Type: Discovery Hearing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTentative Ruling for Demurrer / Motion to Strike published.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSeparate Statement filed by CRUZ-HONORATO, GERADO.; Filed By: CRUZ-HONORATO, GERADO (Cross - Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Compel Discovery filed by CRUZ-HONORATO, GERADO.; Filed By: CRUZ-HONORATO, GERADO (Cross - Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2022
  • DocketDiscovery Hearing scheduled for 12/09/2022 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-60 Matthew C. Braner.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by PEAK DIAGNOSTIC PC.; Filed By: PEAK DIAGNOSTIC PC (Cross - Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (SETH BOBROFF) filed by PEAK DIAGNOSTIC PC.; Filed By: PEAK DIAGNOSTIC PC (Cross - Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOpposition - Other filed by PEAK DIAGNOSTIC PC.; Filed By: PEAK DIAGNOSTIC PC (Cross - Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint filed by PEAK DIAGNOSTIC LLC. Refers to: CRUZ-HONORATO, GERADO; Filed By: PEAK DIAGNOSTIC LLC (Cross - Complainant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by PEAK DIAGNOSTIC LLC.; Filed By: PEAK DIAGNOSTIC LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by WILSHIRE LAW FIRM PLC. Refers to: PEAK DIAGNOSTIC PC; Filed By: WILSHIRE LAW FIRM PLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/27/2023 at 11:15:00 AM at Central in C-60 Matthew C. Braner.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Braner, Matthew.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by WILSHIRE LAW FIRM PLC. Refers to: PEAK DIAGNOSTIC PC; WANG, MICHAEL; CRUZ-HONORATO, GERADO; Filed By: WILSHIRE LAW FIRM PLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by WILSHIRE LAW FIRM PLC. Refers to: PEAK DIAGNOSTIC PC; WANG, MICHAEL; CRUZ-HONORATO, GERADO; Filed By: WILSHIRE LAW FIRM PLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint in Interpleader filed by WILSHIRE LAW FIRM PLC. Refers to: PEAK DIAGNOSTIC PC; WANG, MICHAEL; CRUZ-HONORATO, GERADO; Filed By: WILSHIRE LAW FIRM PLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less