This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/10/2022 at 10:27:57 (UTC).

Williams vs The City of San Diego

Case Summary

On 05/02/2022 Williams filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against The City of San Diego. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is James A Mangione. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

James A Mangione

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Williams, Cezarina

Defendants

The City of San Diego

City of San Diego

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph, James

Attorney at JUREWITZ LAW GROUP

600 B Street 1450

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant Attorney

Loomis, Daniela N

1200 Third Ave Suite 1100

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Williams, Cezarina. Refers to: The City of San Diego

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Williams, Cezarina. Refers to: The City of San Diego

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Williams, Cezarina. Refers to: The City of San Diego

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address filed by Williams, Cezarina.

Notice of Remote Appearance

Notice of Remote Appearance filed by Williams, Cezarina.

Proof of Service on Defendant

Proof of Service filed by Williams, Cezarina.

Answer

Answer filed by City of San Diego.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-75; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Williams, Cezarina.; Filed By: Williams, Cezarina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by City of San Diego.; Filed By: City of San Diego (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearance filed by Williams, Cezarina.; Filed By: Williams, Cezarina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketConsent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address filed by Williams, Cezarina.; Filed By: Williams, Cezarina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/30/2022 at 10:15:00 AM at Central in C-75 James A Mangione.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Mangione, James.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Williams, Cezarina. Refers to: The City of San Diego; Filed By: Williams, Cezarina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Williams, Cezarina. Refers to: The City of San Diego; Filed By: Williams, Cezarina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Williams, Cezarina. Refers to: The City of San Diego; City of San Diego; Filed By: Williams, Cezarina (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOOMIS, DANIELA N.