This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/30/2022 at 12:12:06 (UTC).

Williams vs Onesource Distributors LLC

Case Summary

On 07/27/2022 Williams filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Onesource Distributors LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew C. Braner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Matthew C. Braner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Williams, Tyrone

Defendants

INDEPENDENT ELECTRIC SUPPLY INC

ONESOURCE SUPPLY SOLUTIONS LLC

Onesource Distributors LLC

SONEPAR MANAGEMENT US INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Villalba, Orlando J

1875 Century Park E # 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorneys

Chemers, Alexander M

400 S Hope St Suite 1200

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Shipley, Robert L

2784 Gateway Rd Ste 104

Carlsbad, CA 92009

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Williams, Tyrone. Refers to: Onesource Distributors LLC; ONESOURCE SUPPLY SOLUTIONS LLC; SONEPAR MANAGEMENT US INC; INDEPENDENT ELECTRIC SUPPLY INC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Williams, Tyrone. Refers to: Onesource Distributors LLC; ONESOURCE SUPPLY SOLUTIONS LLC; SONEPAR MANAGEMENT US INC; INDEPENDENT ELECTRIC SUPPLY INC

Summons

Original Summons filed by Williams, Tyrone. Refers to: Onesource Distributors LLC; ONESOURCE SUPPLY SOLUTIONS LLC; SONEPAR MANAGEMENT US INC; INDEPENDENT ELECTRIC SUPPLY INC

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Williams, Tyrone. Refers to: INDEPENDENT ELECTRIC SUPPLY INC

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Williams, Tyrone. Refers to: ONESOURCE SUPPLY SOLUTIONS LLC

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Williams, Tyrone. Refers to: SONEPAR MANAGEMENT US INC

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Williams, Tyrone. Refers to: Onesource Distributors LLC

OSS General Denial and POS

General Denial filed by ONESOURCE SUPPLY SOLUTIONS LLC.

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by Onesource Distributors LLC; SONEPAR MANAGEMENT US INC; INDEPENDENT ELECTRIC SUPPLY INC.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-60; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Onesource Distributors LLC; SONEPAR MANAGEMENT US INC; INDEPENDENT ELECTRIC SUPPLY INC.; Filed By: Onesource Distributors LLC (Defendant); SONEPAR MANAGEMENT US INC (Defendant); INDEPENDENT ELECTRIC SUPPLY INC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Denial filed by ONESOURCE SUPPLY SOLUTIONS LLC.; Filed By: ONESOURCE SUPPLY SOLUTIONS LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Williams, Tyrone. Refers to: Onesource Distributors LLC; Filed By: Williams, Tyrone (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Williams, Tyrone. Refers to: SONEPAR MANAGEMENT US INC; Filed By: Williams, Tyrone (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Williams, Tyrone. Refers to: ONESOURCE SUPPLY SOLUTIONS LLC; Filed By: Williams, Tyrone (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Williams, Tyrone. Refers to: INDEPENDENT ELECTRIC SUPPLY INC; Filed By: Williams, Tyrone (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 01/20/2023 at 10:45:00 AM at Central in C-60 Matthew C. Braner.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Braner, Matthew.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Williams, Tyrone. Refers to: Onesource Distributors LLC; ONESOURCE SUPPLY SOLUTIONS LLC; SONEPAR MANAGEMENT US INC; INDEPENDENT ELECTRIC SUPPLY INC; Filed By: Williams, Tyrone (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Williams, Tyrone. Refers to: Onesource Distributors LLC; ONESOURCE SUPPLY SOLUTIONS LLC; SONEPAR MANAGEMENT US INC; INDEPENDENT ELECTRIC SUPPLY INC; Filed By: Williams, Tyrone (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Williams, Tyrone. Refers to: Onesource Distributors LLC; ONESOURCE SUPPLY SOLUTIONS LLC; SONEPAR MANAGEMENT US INC; INDEPENDENT ELECTRIC SUPPLY INC; Filed By: Williams, Tyrone (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SONEPAR MANAGEMENT US INC is a litigant

Latest cases where ONESOURCE SUPPLY SOLUTIONS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Independent Electric Supply, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS, LLC. A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant