This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 09/16/2018 at 05:24:06 (UTC).

Williams vs DS Services of America Inc

Case Summary

On 09/11/2017 Williams filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against DS Services of America Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOEL R. WOHLFEIL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JOEL R. WOHLFEIL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILLIAMS, LANETTE

Defendants

SPARKLETTS

DS SERVICES OF AMERICA INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHIVINSKI, ANDREW R

Attorney at CHIVINSKI LAW FIRM APC

1350 Columbia St Unit 401

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 03/09/2018 at 01:30:00 PM in C-73 before Joel R. Wohlfeil at Central.

Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Granted in Whole) filed by Williams, Lanette.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Williams, Lanette. Refers to: DS Services of America Inc; Sparkletts

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Williams, Lanette. Refers to: DS Services of America Inc; Sparkletts

Complaint

Complaint filed by Williams, Lanette. Refers to: DS Services of America Inc; Sparkletts

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Williams, Lanette.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 03/09/2018 01:30:00 PM.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 05/04/2018 at 09:00:00 AM in C-73 before Joel R. Wohlfeil at Central.

Notice - Other

Notice - Other (Of Case Management Conference) filed by Williams, Lanette.

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record

Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record filed by Williams, Lanette.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 05/04/2018 09:00:00 AM.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Order to Show Cause (Sanctions) SD

Order to Show Cause (Sanctions) SD generated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 08/17/2018 02:00:00 PM.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order to Show Cause (Sanctions) SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 08/17/2018 02:00:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • Civil Case Management Conference continued pursuant to Court's motion to 09/21/2018 at 02:00PM before Judge Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed scheduled for 09/21/2018 at 02:00PM before Judge Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 05/04/2018 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • Civil Case Management Conference continued pursuant to Court's motion to 08/17/2018 at 02:00PM before Judge Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice - Other (Of Case Management Conference) filed by Williams, Lanette. Filed By: Williams, Lanette (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Be Relieved as Counsel of Record filed by Williams, Lanette. Filed By: Williams, Lanette (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 03/09/2018 at 01:30:00 PM in C-73 before Joel R. Wohlfeil at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Granted in Whole) filed by Williams, Lanette. Filed By: Williams, Lanette (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/16/2018 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • Request to Waive Court Fees filed by Williams, Lanette. Filed By: Williams, Lanette (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Williams, Lanette. Refers to: DS Services of America Inc; Sparkletts Filed By: Williams, Lanette (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Williams, Lanette. Refers to: DS Services of America Inc; Sparkletts Filed By: Williams, Lanette (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Williams, Lanette. Refers to: DS Services of America Inc; Sparkletts Filed By: Williams, Lanette (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DS SERVICES OF AMERICA INC. (DOE 2) is a litigant

Latest cases where SPARKLETTS (DOE 1) is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHIVINSKI ANDREW