This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/04/2022 at 08:07:09 (UTC).

Williams vs Ball Automotive Group

Case Summary

On 06/02/2022 Williams filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Ball Automotive Group. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kenneth J Medel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kenneth J Medel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Williams, Laseni

Defendants

Ball Automotive Group; DBA : Ball Kia

Webster, Dante

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Turlington, Alan Shane

Attorney at TUSH LAW LTD

1415 Warner Ave B

Tustin, CA 92780

Defendant Attorney

Thurston, Chad M

101 West Broadway 810

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Complaint (Case Initiation)

Complaint filed by Williams, Laseni. Refers to: Ball Automotive Group; Webster, Dante

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Cover Sheets)

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Williams, Laseni. Refers to: Ball Automotive Group; Webster, Dante

Original Summons (Warrants/Issuance Returns)

Original Summons filed by Williams, Laseni. Refers to: Ball Automotive Group; Webster, Dante

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service filed by Williams, Laseni.

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by Webster, Dante; Ball Automotive Group.

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service filed by Webster, Dante; Ball Automotive Group.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-66; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Webster, Dante; Ball Automotive Group.; Filed By: Webster, Dante (Defendant); Ball Automotive Group (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Webster, Dante; Ball Automotive Group.; Filed By: Webster, Dante (Defendant); Ball Automotive Group (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Williams, Laseni.; Filed By: Williams, Laseni (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/10/2023 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-66 Kenneth J Medel.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Medel, Kenneth.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Williams, Laseni. Refers to: Ball Automotive Group; Webster, Dante; Filed By: Williams, Laseni (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Williams, Laseni. Refers to: Ball Automotive Group; Webster, Dante; Filed By: Williams, Laseni (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Williams, Laseni. Refers to: Ball Automotive Group; Webster, Dante; Filed By: Williams, Laseni (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ball Automotive Group is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TURLINGTON ALAN S.