This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/27/2020 at 01:11:25 (UTC).

Wieczorek vs Holman Automotive Group

Case Summary

On 10/16/2019 Wieczorek filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Holman Automotive Group. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Stayed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Stayed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wieczorek, Mark

Defendants

Holman Automotive Group; DBA : Land Rover San Diego

Holman Automotive Group, Inc; DBA : Land Rover San Diego

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Small Claims Court Trial heard 02/25/2020 08:00:00 AM.

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) SD

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) SD generated.

Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Certified Mail by Clerk

Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Certified Mail by Clerk filed by Wieczorek, Mark. Refers to: Holman Automotive Group

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Wieczorek, Mark. Refers to: Holman Automotive Group

Notice to Filing Party SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Correspondence

Correspondence (Request: Certified Mail for Service through the Court) filed by Wieczorek, Mark.

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Filing Party SD

[A document for ROA# 6]

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketHolman Automotive Group amended to Holman Automotive Group, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketThe Court finds judgment on the Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court for Holman Automotive Group, DBA Land Rover San Diego and against Mark Wieczorek in the amount of: $0 principal, $0 costs, $ pre-judgment interest.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Small Claims Court Trial heard 02/25/2020 08:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Certified Mail by Clerk filed by Wieczorek, Mark. Refers to: Holman Automotive Group, Inc Filed By: Wieczorek, Mark (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial scheduled for 02/25/2020 at 08:00:00 AM at Central in C-63 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketCertified Mail Green Card Tracking Numbers filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 6]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence (Exhibits submitted with claim) submitted by Wieczorek, Mark rejected on 11/12/2019. Filed By: Wieczorek, Mark (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Wieczorek, Mark. Refers to: Holman Automotive Group, Inc Filed By: Wieczorek, Mark (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-63.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence (Request: Certified Mail for Service through the Court) filed by Wieczorek, Mark. Filed By: Wieczorek, Mark (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOLMAN AUTOMOBILE GROUP, INC. is a litigant