This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/27/2021 at 10:18:36 (UTC).

Whitmore vs Global Payments Inc

Case Summary

On 10/14/2020 Whitmore filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against Global Payments Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Eddie C Sturgeon. The case status is Other - Transferred.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Eddie C Sturgeon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WHITMORE, JAMICA

Defendants

GLOBAL PAYMENT HOLDING COMPANY

Global Payments Inc

HEARTLAND PAYMENT SYSTEMS LLC

SEIRER, DARCY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Potter, M Rene

9845 Erma Rd Suite 300

San Diego, CA 92131

Defendant Attorney

Owen, Kaitlin H

Attorney at ALSTON & BIRD LLP

333 South Hope Street 16Th Fl

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons (Warrants/Issuance Returns) (Warrants/Issuance Returns)

Original Summons filed by WHITMORE, JAMICA. Refers to: Global Payments Inc; HEARTLAND PAYMENT SYSTEMS LLC; GLOBAL PAYMENT HOLDING COMPANY; SEIRER, DARCY

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Cover Sheets)

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by WHITMORE, JAMICA. Refers to: Global Payments Inc; HEARTLAND PAYMENT SYSTEMS LLC; GLOBAL PAYMENT HOLDING COMPANY; SEIRER, DARCY

Complaint (Case Initiation)

Complaint filed by WHITMORE, JAMICA. Refers to: Global Payments Inc; HEARTLAND PAYMENT SYSTEMS LLC; GLOBAL PAYMENT HOLDING COMPANY; SEIRER, DARCY

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by WHITMORE, JAMICA. Refers to: SEIRER, DARCY

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by WHITMORE, JAMICA. Refers to: GLOBAL PAYMENT HOLDING COMPANY

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by WHITMORE, JAMICA. Refers to: Global Payments Inc

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by WHITMORE, JAMICA. Refers to: HEARTLAND PAYMENT SYSTEMS LLC

NOTICE TO SUPERIOR COURT AND ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT

Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed by GLOBAL PAYMENT HOLDING COMPANY; Global Payments Inc; HEARTLAND PAYMENT SYSTEMS LLC; SEIRER, DARCY.

DEFENDANTS GLOBAL PAYMENTS INC HEARTLAND PAYMENT SYSTEMS LLC AND GLOBAL PAYMENT HOLDING COMPANYS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF JAMICA WHITMORES UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

Answer filed by GLOBAL PAYMENT HOLDING COMPANY; Global Payments Inc; HEARTLAND PAYMENT SYSTEMS LLC.

DEFENDANT DARCY SIERERS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF JAMICA WHITMORES UNVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES

Answer filed by SEIRER, DARCY.

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/25/2021 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court filed by GLOBAL PAYMENT HOLDING COMPANY; Global Payments Inc; HEARTLAND PAYMENT SYSTEMS LLC; SEIRER, DARCY. Filed By: GLOBAL PAYMENT HOLDING COMPANY (Defendant); Global Payments Inc (Defendant); HEARTLAND PAYMENT SYSTEMS LLC (Defendant); SEIRER, DARCY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by SEIRER, DARCY. Filed By: SEIRER, DARCY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by GLOBAL PAYMENT HOLDING COMPANY; Global Payments Inc; HEARTLAND PAYMENT SYSTEMS LLC. Filed By: GLOBAL PAYMENT HOLDING COMPANY (Defendant); Global Payments Inc (Defendant); HEARTLAND PAYMENT SYSTEMS LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by WHITMORE, JAMICA. Refers to: SEIRER, DARCY Filed By: WHITMORE, JAMICA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by WHITMORE, JAMICA. Refers to: HEARTLAND PAYMENT SYSTEMS LLC Filed By: WHITMORE, JAMICA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by WHITMORE, JAMICA. Refers to: Global Payments Inc Filed By: WHITMORE, JAMICA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by WHITMORE, JAMICA. Refers to: GLOBAL PAYMENT HOLDING COMPANY Filed By: WHITMORE, JAMICA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/25/2021 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by WHITMORE, JAMICA. Refers to: Global Payments Inc; HEARTLAND PAYMENT SYSTEMS LLC; GLOBAL PAYMENT HOLDING COMPANY; SEIRER, DARCY Filed By: WHITMORE, JAMICA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by WHITMORE, JAMICA. Refers to: Global Payments Inc; HEARTLAND PAYMENT SYSTEMS LLC; GLOBAL PAYMENT HOLDING COMPANY; SEIRER, DARCY Filed By: WHITMORE, JAMICA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by WHITMORE, JAMICA. Refers to: Global Payments Inc; HEARTLAND PAYMENT SYSTEMS LLC; GLOBAL PAYMENT HOLDING COMPANY; SEIRER, DARCY Filed By: WHITMORE, JAMICA (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Sturgeon, Eddie.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Heartland Payment Systems, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Global Payments Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Potter, M Rene