Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/25/2021 at 06:50:13 (UTC).

White VS City of San Diego

Case Summary

On 06/24/2020 White filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against City of San Diego. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard E. L. Strauss. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Richard E. L. Strauss

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

White, Charles

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Clark, William

CTE Inc

San Diego Gas & Electric

Clark, Reginald

City of San Diego

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

CTE Inc

San Diego Gas & Electric

City of San Diego

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Browne, Kimberly K

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF KIMBERLY K BROWNE

Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Dwyer, Ross C

Attorney at TYSON AND MENDES

Lee, Kathryn C.

Smith, Raul Olamendi

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE GENERAL COUNSEL SAN DIEGO GAS &

Massey, Valerie Silverman

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE CITY ATTORNEY

 

Court Documents

Answer

Answer filed by CTE Inc; Clark, Reginald; Clark, William.

Answer

Answer filed by City of San Diego.

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by City of San Diego. Refers to: CTE Inc

Answer of CTE, et al to X-Comp of City

Answer filed by CTE Inc; Clark, Reginald; Clark, William.

Cross-Complaint of C.T.E. et al

Cross-Complaint filed by CTE Inc; Clark, Reginald; Clark, William. Refers to: San Diego Gas & Electric; City of San Diego

CROSS-DEFENDANT SAN DIEGO GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANYS ANSWER TO THE CROSS-COMPLAINT OF CROSS-COMPLAINANTS C.T.E., INC., WILLIAM CLARK, AND REGINALD CLARK

Answer filed by San Diego Gas & Electric.

PROOF OF SERVICE

Proof of Service filed by San Diego Gas & Electric.

Answer

Answer filed by City of San Diego.

DEFENDANT SAN DIEGO GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANYS ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF CHARLES WHITES COMPLAINT

Answer filed by San Diego Gas & Electric.

PROOF OF SERVICE

Proof of Service filed by San Diego Gas & Electric.

Complaint

Complaint filed by White, Charles. Refers to: City of San Diego; CTE Inc; Clark, Reginald; Clark, William; San Diego Gas & Electric

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by White, Charles. Refers to: City of San Diego; CTE Inc; Clark, Reginald; Clark, William; San Diego Gas & Electric

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by White, Charles. Refers to: City of San Diego; CTE Inc; Clark, Reginald; Clark, William; San Diego Gas & Electric

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/04/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-75; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by City of San Diego. Filed By: City of San Diego (Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by San Diego Gas & Electric. Filed By: San Diego Gas & Electric (Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by San Diego Gas & Electric. Filed By: San Diego Gas & Electric (Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by CTE Inc; Clark, Reginald; Clark, William. Filed By: CTE Inc (Defendant); Clark, Reginald (Defendant); Clark, William (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint filed by CTE Inc; Clark, Reginald; Clark, William. Refers to: San Diego Gas & Electric; City of San Diego Filed By: CTE Inc (Cross - Complainant); Clark, Reginald (Cross - Complainant); Clark, William (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by City of San Diego. Filed By: City of San Diego (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint filed by City of San Diego. Refers to: CTE Inc Filed By: City of San Diego (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by CTE Inc; Clark, Reginald; Clark, William. Filed By: CTE Inc (Defendant); Clark, Reginald (Defendant); Clark, William (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by San Diego Gas & Electric. Filed By: San Diego Gas & Electric (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by San Diego Gas & Electric. Filed By: San Diego Gas & Electric (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by White, Charles. Refers to: City of San Diego; CTE Inc; Clark, Reginald; Clark, William; San Diego Gas & Electric Filed By: White, Charles (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by White, Charles. Refers to: City of San Diego; CTE Inc; Clark, Reginald; Clark, William; San Diego Gas & Electric Filed By: White, Charles (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by White, Charles. Refers to: City of San Diego; CTE Inc; Clark, Reginald; Clark, William; San Diego Gas & Electric Filed By: White, Charles (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Strauss, Richard.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/04/2021 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-75 Richard E. L. Strauss.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CTE Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where SAN DIEGO GAS & ELECTRIC COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Browne, Kimberly K