Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/17/2018 at 18:50:25 (UTC).

Weston-Valley Center, LLC vs. Olympia Financial Mortgage

Case Summary

On 09/08/2017 Weston-Valley Center, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Olympia Financial Mortgage. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JACQUELINE M. STERN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************O-NC

  • Filing Date:

    09/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JACQUELINE M. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WESTON-VALLEY CENTER, LLC

Defendant

OLYMPIA FINANCIAL MORTGAGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VINACCIA, JACQUELINE S

960 Canterbury Pl

Escondido, CA 92025

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint filed by Weston-Valley Center, LLC. Refers to: Olympia Financial Mortgage

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Weston-Valley Center, LLC. Refers to: Olympia Financial Mortgage

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Weston-Valley Center, LLC. Refers to: Olympia Financial Mortgage

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of Summons Complaint - Unnamed Occupants

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Weston-Valley Center, LLC.

Declaration of Due Diligence

Declaration of Due Diligence filed by Weston-Valley Center, LLC. Refers to: Olympia Financial Mortgage

Proof of Service of Summons Complaint - Unnamed Occupants

Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Weston-Valley Center, LLC.

Declaration of Due Diligence

Declaration of Due Diligence filed by Weston-Valley Center, LLC. Refers to: Olympia Financial Mortgage

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by Weston-Valley Center, LLC. Refers to: Olympia Financial Mortgage

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by Weston-Valley Center, LLC.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2017
  • The default filed by Weston-Valley Center, LLC was entered as to Olympia Financial Mortgage on Complaint . Override feature used.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Entry of Default filed by Weston-Valley Center, LLC. Filed By: Weston-Valley Center, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Entry of Default filed by Weston-Valley Center, LLC. Refers to: Olympia Financial Mortgage Filed By: Weston-Valley Center, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Due Diligence filed by Weston-Valley Center, LLC. Refers to: Olympia Financial Mortgage Filed By: Weston-Valley Center, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Weston-Valley Center, LLC. Filed By: Weston-Valley Center, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration of Due Diligence filed by Weston-Valley Center, LLC. Refers to: Olympia Financial Mortgage Filed By: Weston-Valley Center, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of Summons & Complaint - Unnamed Occupants filed by Weston-Valley Center, LLC. Filed By: Weston-Valley Center, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/25/2018 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-27 Jacqueline M. Stern.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Stern, Jacqueline.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2017
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Weston-Valley Center, LLC. Refers to: Olympia Financial Mortgage Filed By: Weston-Valley Center, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Weston-Valley Center, LLC. Refers to: Olympia Financial Mortgage Filed By: Weston-Valley Center, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Weston-Valley Center, LLC. Refers to: Olympia Financial Mortgage Filed By: Weston-Valley Center, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OLYMPIA FINANCIAL MORTGAGE INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jacqueline Suzanne Vinaccia