This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/10/2023 at 02:14:53 (UTC).

Western Surety Company vs TL Scanlan Construction Inc

Case Summary

On 03/04/2022 Western Surety Company filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TL Scanlan Construction Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew C. Braner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Matthew C. Braner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Western Surety Company

Defendants

Environment & Space Designers Inc

Jade Shores LLC

TL Scanlan Construction Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PAGAN, JOHN M

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF HAUSMAN & SOSA LLP

20750 Ventura Boulevard 105

Woodland Hills, CA 91364-6646

 

Court Documents

Complaint in Interpleader

Complaint in Interpleader filed by Western Surety Company. Refers to: Environment & Space Designers Inc; Jade Shores LLC; TL Scanlan Construction Inc

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Western Surety Company. Refers to: Environment & Space Designers Inc; Jade Shores LLC; TL Scanlan Construction Inc

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Western Surety Company. Refers to: Environment & Space Designers Inc; Jade Shores LLC; TL Scanlan Construction Inc

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Western Surety Company. Refers to: Jade Shores LLC

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Western Surety Company. Refers to: TL Scanlan Construction Inc

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Western Surety Company. Refers to: Environment & Space Designers Inc

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 10/28/2022 at 10:15:00 AM in C-60 before Matthew C. Braner at Central.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Western Surety Company.

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by Western Surety Company. Refers to: TL Scanlan Construction Inc

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/28/2022 10:15:00 AM.

Notice of Status Conference

Notice of Hearing filed by Western Surety Company.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-60; Event Type: Status Conference (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing filed by Western Surety Company.; Filed By: Western Surety Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/28/2022 10:15:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketStatus Conference (Civil) scheduled for 01/27/2023 at 11:00AM before Judge Matthew C. Braner.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default filed by Western Surety Company. Refers to: TL Scanlan Construction Inc; Filed By: Western Surety Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Western Surety Company.; Filed By: Western Surety Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketThe default filed by Western Surety Company was entered as to TL Scanlan Construction Inc on Complaint in Interpleader . Override feature used.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/28/2022 at 10:15:00 AM at Central in C-60 Matthew C. Braner.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 10/28/2022 at 10:15:00 AM in C-60 before Matthew C. Braner at Central.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Western Surety Company. Refers to: Environment & Space Designers Inc; Filed By: Western Surety Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Western Surety Company. Refers to: TL Scanlan Construction Inc; Filed By: Western Surety Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Western Surety Company. Refers to: Jade Shores LLC; Filed By: Western Surety Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/30/2022 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-60 Matthew C. Braner.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Braner, Matthew.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Western Surety Company. Refers to: Environment & Space Designers Inc; Jade Shores LLC; TL Scanlan Construction Inc; Filed By: Western Surety Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Western Surety Company. Refers to: Environment & Space Designers Inc; Jade Shores LLC; TL Scanlan Construction Inc; Filed By: Western Surety Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint in Interpleader filed by Western Surety Company. Refers to: Environment & Space Designers Inc; Jade Shores LLC; TL Scanlan Construction Inc; Filed By: Western Surety Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less