This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 10/31/2021 at 08:10:42 (UTC).

WESTERN SURETY COMPANY vs STEPHENS

Case Summary

On 08/02/2021 WESTERN SURETY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against STEPHENS. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cynthia A. Freeland. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************C-NC

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Cynthia A. Freeland

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Western Surety Company, a corporation

Defendants

Meakins, Jeff

Meakins, Kelly

Pure Acai & Juice Bar, an entity of unknow origin

Stephens, Gregory Vaughn

Redford, John R.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sosa, Carlos E.

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF HAUSMAN & SOSA LLP

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Western Surety Company, a corporation.

Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Western Surety Company, a corporation. Refers to: Redford, John

Amendment to Complaint - DOE 6

Amendment to Complaint/Cross-Complaint naming Doe (***DOE 6***) filed by Western Surety Company, a corporation. Refers to: Redford, John

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by Western Surety Company, a corporation. Refers to: Pure Acai & Juice Bar, an entity of unknow origin

Affidavit - 1

Declaration of Diligent Search filed by Western Surety Company, a corporation. Refers to: Stephens, Gregory

Affidavit - Other 2

Declaration of Diligent Search filed by Western Surety Company, a corporation. Refers to: Meakins, Jeff

Affidavit - Other

Declaration of Diligent Search filed by Western Surety Company, a corporation. Refers to: Meakins, Kelly

Affidavit - Other 4

Declaration of Diligent Search filed by Western Surety Company, a corporation. Refers to: Pure Acai & Juice Bar, an entity of unknow origin

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Western Surety Company, a corporation. Refers to: Meakins, Jeff

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Western Surety Company, a corporation. Refers to: Meakins, Kelly

General Denial

General Denial filed by Meakins, Jeff; Meakins, Kelly. Refers to: Western Surety Company, a corporation

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 20]

General Denial

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Complaint in Interpleader

Complaint in Interpleader filed by Western Surety Company, a corporation. Refers to: Stephens, Gregory; Meakins, Jeff; Meakins, Kelly; Pure Acai & Juice Bar, an entity of unknow origin

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Western Surety Company, a corporation. Refers to: Stephens, Gregory; Meakins, Jeff; Meakins, Kelly; Pure Acai & Juice Bar, an entity of unknow origin

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Western Surety Company, a corporation. Refers to: Stephens, Gregory; Meakins, Jeff; Meakins, Kelly; Pure Acai & Juice Bar, an entity of unknow origin

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2022
  • HearingLocation: N-27; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint in Interpleader

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Western Surety Company, a corporation. Filed By: Western Surety Company, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Western Surety Company, a corporation. Refers to: Redford, John Filed By: Western Surety Company, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 20]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Denial filed by Meakins, Jeff; Meakins, Kelly. Refers to: Western Surety Company, a corporation Filed By: Meakins, Jeff (Defendant); Meakins, Kelly (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Western Surety Company, a corporation. Refers to: Meakins, Jeff Filed By: Western Surety Company, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Western Surety Company, a corporation. Refers to: Meakins, Kelly Filed By: Western Surety Company, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint in Interpleader dismissed without prejudice as to Pure Acai & Juice Bar, an entity of unknow origin.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • DocketComplaint in Interpleader dismissed without prejudice as to Western Surety Company, a corporation.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Diligent Search filed by Western Surety Company, a corporation. Refers to: Meakins, Kelly Filed By: Western Surety Company, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration of Diligent Search filed by Western Surety Company, a corporation. Refers to: Pure Acai & Juice Bar, an entity of unknow origin Filed By: Western Surety Company, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/17/2022 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-27 Cynthia A. Freeland.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint in Interpleader filed by Western Surety Company, a corporation. Refers to: Stephens, Gregory; Meakins, Jeff; Meakins, Kelly; Pure Acai & Juice Bar, an entity of unknow origin; Redford, John Filed By: Western Surety Company, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Western Surety Company, a corporation. Refers to: Stephens, Gregory; Meakins, Jeff; Meakins, Kelly; Pure Acai & Juice Bar, an entity of unknow origin Filed By: Western Surety Company, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Western Surety Company, a corporation. Refers to: Stephens, Gregory; Meakins, Jeff; Meakins, Kelly; Pure Acai & Juice Bar, an entity of unknow origin Filed By: Western Surety Company, a corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Freeland, Cynthia.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Western Surety Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SOSA, CARLOS E