This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/06/2022 at 08:01:36 (UTC).

Western Surety Company vs. Empire Solar Group LLC

Case Summary

On 12/06/2021 Western Surety Company filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Empire Solar Group LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Joel R. Wohlfeil. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Joel R. Wohlfeil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Western Surety Company

Defendants

CHARLTON, TYLER

Empire Solar Group LLC; DBA : Empire Solar Electric Group

Onesource Distributors LLC

PROFESSIONAL CONTRACTORS SUPPLIES INC

PW STEPHENS ENVIRONMENTAL INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sosa, Carlos E.

Defendant Attorney

Scholefield, Pamela J

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Western Surety Company. Refers to: Empire Solar Group LLC; Onesource Distributors LLC; CHARLTON, TYLER; PW STEPHENS ENVIRONMENTAL INC; PROFESSIONAL CONTRACTORS SUPPLIES INC

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Western Surety Company. Refers to: Empire Solar Group LLC; Onesource Distributors LLC; CHARLTON, TYLER; PW STEPHENS ENVIRONMENTAL INC; PROFESSIONAL CONTRACTORS SUPPLIES INC

Complaint in Interpleader

Complaint in Interpleader filed by Western Surety Company. Refers to: Empire Solar Group LLC; Onesource Distributors LLC; CHARLTON, TYLER; PW STEPHENS ENVIRONMENTAL INC; PROFESSIONAL CONTRACTORS SUPPLIES INC

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by Western Surety Company. Refers to: PROFESSIONAL CONTRACTORS SUPPLIES INC

Proof of Personal Service - Petition

Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Western Surety Company. Refers to: Empire Solar Group LLC

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by Western Surety Company. Refers to: CHARLTON, TYLER

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (as to PW Stephens Environmental Inc ONLY) filed by Western Surety Company. Refers to: PW STEPHENS ENVIRONMENTAL INC

Proof of Personal Service - Petition

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Western Surety Company.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Western Surety Company.

Proof of Personal Service - Petition

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Western Surety Company.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Onesource Distributors LLC.

VERIFIED ANSWER OF ONESOURCE DISTRIBUTORS LLC TO THE VERIFIED INTERPLEADER OF WESTERN SURETY COMPANY

Answer filed by Onesource Distributors LLC.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-73; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint in Interpleader

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default filed by Western Surety Company. Refers to: CHARLTON, TYLER Filed By: Western Surety Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketThe default filed by Western Surety Company was entered as to CHARLTON, TYLER on Complaint in Interpleader . Override feature used.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Western Surety Company. Filed By: Western Surety Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Western Surety Company. Filed By: Western Surety Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Western Surety Company. Filed By: Western Surety Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (as to PW Stephens Environmental Inc ONLY) filed by Western Surety Company. Refers to: PW STEPHENS ENVIRONMENTAL INC Filed By: Western Surety Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketComplaint in Interpleader dismissed without prejudice as to PW STEPHENS ENVIRONMENTAL INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Onesource Distributors LLC. Filed By: Onesource Distributors LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Onesource Distributors LLC. Filed By: Onesource Distributors LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Western Surety Company. Refers to: Empire Solar Group LLC Filed By: Western Surety Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketComplaint in Interpleader dismissed without prejudice as to PROFESSIONAL CONTRACTORS SUPPLIES INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by Western Surety Company. Refers to: PROFESSIONAL CONTRACTORS SUPPLIES INC Filed By: Western Surety Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint in Interpleader filed by Western Surety Company. Refers to: Empire Solar Group LLC; Onesource Distributors LLC; CHARLTON, TYLER; PW STEPHENS ENVIRONMENTAL INC; PROFESSIONAL CONTRACTORS SUPPLIES INC Filed By: Western Surety Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Western Surety Company. Refers to: Empire Solar Group LLC; Onesource Distributors LLC; CHARLTON, TYLER; PW STEPHENS ENVIRONMENTAL INC; PROFESSIONAL CONTRACTORS SUPPLIES INC Filed By: Western Surety Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Western Surety Company. Refers to: Empire Solar Group LLC; Onesource Distributors LLC; CHARLTON, TYLER; PW STEPHENS ENVIRONMENTAL INC; PROFESSIONAL CONTRACTORS SUPPLIES INC Filed By: Western Surety Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/06/2022 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less