Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/12/2021 at 03:44:53 (UTC).

West vs Susanna Starcevic interim trustee Sweet Family Trust Dated July 20, 1989

Case Summary

On 10/13/2020 West filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Susanna Starcevic interim trustee Sweet Family Trust Dated July 20, 1989. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard E. L. Strauss. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Richard E. L. Strauss

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

West, Judy

Defendants

Hughes Management Corporation; DBA : Hughes Management

Susanna Starcevic interim trustee Sweet Family Trust Dated July 20, 1989

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thompson, Anthony D

Defendant Attorney

ROBERTS, JASON S

 

Court Documents

Notice of Related Case

Notice of Related Case (re: 2020-19081) filed by Hughes Management Corporation.

Demurrer

Demurrer (With Declaration) filed by Hughes Management Corporation.

Motion to Strike

Motion to Strike (Portions of Plaintiffs Complaint; With Declaration) filed by Hughes Management Corporation.

Complaint

Complaint filed by West, Judy. Refers to: Susanna Starcevic interim trustee Sweet Family Trust Dated July 20, 1989; Hughes Management Corporation

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by West, Judy. Refers to: Susanna Starcevic interim trustee Sweet Family Trust Dated July 20, 1989; Hughes Management Corporation

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by West, Judy. Refers to: Susanna Starcevic interim trustee Sweet Family Trust Dated July 20, 1989; Hughes Management Corporation

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-75; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-75; Event Type: Demurrer / Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-75; Event Type: Demurrer / Motion to Strike

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemurrer (With Declaration) filed by Hughes Management Corporation. Filed By: Hughes Management Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Strike (Portions of Plaintiffs Complaint; With Declaration) filed by Hughes Management Corporation. Filed By: Hughes Management Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketDemurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 05/14/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-75 Richard E. L. Strauss.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketDemurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 05/14/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-75 Richard E. L. Strauss.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Related Case (re: 2020-19081) filed by Hughes Management Corporation. Filed By: Hughes Management Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 09/03/2021 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-75 Richard E. L. Strauss.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by West, Judy. Refers to: Susanna Starcevic interim trustee Sweet Family Trust Dated July 20, 1989; Hughes Management Corporation Filed By: West, Judy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by West, Judy. Refers to: Susanna Starcevic interim trustee Sweet Family Trust Dated July 20, 1989; Hughes Management Corporation Filed By: West, Judy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by West, Judy. Refers to: Susanna Starcevic interim trustee Sweet Family Trust Dated July 20, 1989; Hughes Management Corporation Filed By: West, Judy (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Strauss, Richard.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thompson, Anthony D