This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/04/2023 at 07:11:21 (UTC).

Wesco Insurance Company, a subsidiary of AmTrust Financial Services Inc vs NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/03/2023 Wesco Insurance Company, a subsidiary of AmTrust Financial Services Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Earl H. Maas, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************C-NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Earl H. Maas, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wesco Insurance Company, a subsidiary of AmTrust Financial Services Inc

Defendants

NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Scottsdale Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Carvalho, Jeffrey P

8989 Rio San Diego Drive 368

San Diego, CA 92108

RETZ, KIRK J

8989 Rio San Diego Drive 368

San Diego, CA 92108

Ryan, Norman A

8989 Rio San Diego Drive 368

San Diego, CA 92108

Defendant Attorney

GRIFFIN, JOHN T

1851 E First Street 10Th Floor

Santa Ana, CA 92705

 

Court Documents

Wesco Insurance Company's Subrogation Complaint

Complaint filed by Wesco Insurance Company, a subsidiary of AmTrust Financial Services Inc. Refers to: NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY; Scottsdale Insurance Company

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wesco Insurance Company, a subsidiary of AmTrust Financial Services Inc. Refers to: NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY; Scottsdale Insurance Company

Summons on Complaint

Original Summons filed by Wesco Insurance Company, a subsidiary of AmTrust Financial Services Inc. Refers to: NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY; Scottsdale Insurance Company

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company; NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2023
  • HearingLocation: N-28; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company; NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY.; Filed By: Scottsdale Insurance Company (Defendant); NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/09/2023 at 10:00:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Maas, Earl.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Wesco Insurance Company, a subsidiary of AmTrust Financial Services Inc. Refers to: NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY; Scottsdale Insurance Company; Filed By: Wesco Insurance Company, a subsidiary of AmTrust Financial Services Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wesco Insurance Company, a subsidiary of AmTrust Financial Services Inc. Refers to: NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY; Scottsdale Insurance Company; Filed By: Wesco Insurance Company, a subsidiary of AmTrust Financial Services Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Wesco Insurance Company, a subsidiary of AmTrust Financial Services Inc. Refers to: NATIONWIDE GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY; Scottsdale Insurance Company; Filed By: Wesco Insurance Company, a subsidiary of AmTrust Financial Services Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less