Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/20/2021 at 06:35:58 (UTC).

Wesco Distribution Inc vs CM Electric A/V Automations Incorporated

Case Summary

On 12/22/2020 Wesco Distribution Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CM Electric A/V Automations Incorporated. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Joel R. Wohlfeil. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Joel R. Wohlfeil

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wesco Distribution Inc

Defendants

The Western Surety Company

CM Electric A/V Automations Incorporated; DBA : CM Solar Electric

Melendez, Carlos

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sifferd, Joseph A

Attorney at POINDEXTER & DOUTRE INC

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 05/27/2021 at 01:30:00 PM in C-73 before Joel R. Wohlfeil at Central.

Complaint for Money for (1) Breach of Contract; (2) Open Book Account; (3) Goods Sold and Delivered; (4) Accounts Stated; (5) Claim on Contractor's License Bond

Complaint filed by Wesco Distribution Inc. Refers to: CM Electric A/V Automations Incorporated; Melendez, Carlos; The Western Surety Company

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wesco Distribution Inc. Refers to: CM Electric A/V Automations Incorporated; Melendez, Carlos; The Western Surety Company

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Wesco Distribution Inc. Refers to: CM Electric A/V Automations Incorporated; Melendez, Carlos; The Western Surety Company

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-73; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe Civil Case Management Conference was rescheduled to 05/27/2021 at 01:30:00 PM in C-73 before Joel R. Wohlfeil at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/27/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/28/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-73 Joel R. Wohlfeil.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Wesco Distribution Inc. Refers to: CM Electric A/V Automations Incorporated; Melendez, Carlos; The Western Surety Company Filed By: Wesco Distribution Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wesco Distribution Inc. Refers to: CM Electric A/V Automations Incorporated; Melendez, Carlos; The Western Surety Company Filed By: Wesco Distribution Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Wesco Distribution Inc. Refers to: CM Electric A/V Automations Incorporated; Melendez, Carlos; The Western Surety Company Filed By: Wesco Distribution Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Wohlfeil, Joel.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CM Electric A/V Automations Incorporated; DBA : CM Solar Electric is a litigant

Latest cases where WESCO DISTRIBUTION INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Western Surety Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIFFERD JOSEPH ALLEN