This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/26/2022 at 07:02:54 (UTC).

Werner vs Meschko

Case Summary

On 09/27/2022 Werner filed an Other lawsuit against Meschko. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************T-NC

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Werner, Jeanette

Vista, CA 92081

Respondent

Meschko, Kay

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Hearing on Petition to Stop Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse heard 10/20/2022 08:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketRestraining order as requested denied without prejudice.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2022
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR COURT COMMISSIONER TO ACT AS TEMPORARY JUDGE FOR ALL PURPOSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail filed by Meschko, Kay. Refers to: Werner, Jeanette; Filed By: Meschko, Kay (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • DocketResponse to Request for Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Restraining Orders filed by Meschko, Kay. Refers to: Werner, Jeanette; Filed By: Meschko, Kay (Respondent)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service filed by Werner, Jeanette. Refers to: Meschko, Kay; Filed By: Werner, Jeanette (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketHearing on Petition to Stop Elder/Dependent Adult Abuse scheduled for 10/20/2022 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-03 .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Court Hearing (TRO DENIED) filed by Werner, Jeanette. Refers to: Meschko, Kay; Filed By: Werner, Jeanette (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Department N-03.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Werner, Jeanette. Refers to: Meschko, Kay; Filed By: Werner, Jeanette (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketRequest for Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Restraining Orders (Elder or Dependent Adult Abuse Prevention) filed by Werner, Jeanette. Refers to: Meschko, Kay; Filed By: Werner, Jeanette (Petitioner)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less