This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/01/2019 at 06:32:34 (UTC).

Werner Enterprises, Inc. vs. Diapers & Paper of CA, LLC

Case Summary

On 05/12/2010 Werner Enterprises, Inc filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Diapers Paper of CA, LLC. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, South County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KENNETH J MEDEL. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************A-SC

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

KENNETH J MEDEL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WERNER ENTERPRISES INC

Defendants

DIAPERS & PAPER OF CA LLC

TMBC US TRANSFER CORP

LOPEZ, MARIA CAMILA CASTRO; DBA : TRANSPORTES CASTRO

BENAVIDES, JORGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GRAHAM, BRUCE NEILL

Attorney at GRAHAM & ASSOCIATES

4505 Las Virgenes Road 215

Calabasas, CA 91302-1956

Defendant Attorney

WEINER, MICHAEL H

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF MICHAEL H WEINER APC

1660 Hotel Circle North 302

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Cannon,William to Medel,Kenneth effective 02/25/2012

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 06/20/2011 08:30:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Judgment Debtor Exam (Civil) heard 04/13/2012 09:15:00 AM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 06/20/2011 at 08:30:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

Case File Contents as of 06/05/17 - volume 1 of 1

Case File Contents as of 06/05/17 - volume 1 of 1

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case File Contents as of 06/05/17 - volume 1 of 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Judgment Debtor Exam (Civil) heard 04/13/2012 09:15:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2012
  • Case file location changed to South County Courthouse S-Civil Business Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2012
  • Matter was taken off calendar.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2012
  • Judgment Debtor Exam (Civil) scheduled for 04/13/2012 at 09:15:00 AM at South County in S-02 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2012
  • Judgment Debtor Exam (Civil) reassigned to for 04/13/2012 at 09:15:00 AM in S-02 at South County.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case reassigned from Cannon,William to Medel,Kenneth effective 02/25/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2012
  • Order for Appearance and Examination of Judgment Debtor issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2012
  • Judgment Debtor Exam (Civil) scheduled for 04/13/2012 at 09:15:00 AM at South County in S-01 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2012
  • Application and Order for Appearance and Examination of Judgment Debtor filed by Werner Enterprises Inc. Refers to: Diapers & Paper of CA LLC Filed By: Werner Enterprises Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 09/16/2010
  • Demurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 09/24/2010 at 08:35:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2010
  • Opposition to Noticed Motion and Supporting Declarations (DEMURRER) filed by Werner Enterprises Inc. Filed By: Werner Enterprises Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2010
  • Demurrer filed by Diapers & Paper of CA, LLC; Benavides, Jorge. Refers to: Werner Enterprises Inc Filed By: Diapers & Paper of CA LLC (Defendant); Benavides, Jorge (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2010
  • Demurrer / Motion to Strike scheduled for 09/24/2010 at 08:35:00 AM at South County in S-04 William S. Cannon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2010
  • The default filed by Werner Enterprises, Inc. was entered as to TMBC U.S. Transfer Corp. on Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 . Override feature used.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2010
  • Request for Entry of Default filed by Werner Enterprises, Inc..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2010
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Cannon, William.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2010
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2010
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Werner Enterprises, Inc.. Refers to: Diapers & Paper of CA LLC; TMBC US Transfer Corp; Benavides, Jorge Filed By: Werner Enterprises Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2010
  • Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Werner Enterprises, Inc.. Refers to: Diapers & Paper of CA LLC; TMBC US Transfer Corp; Benavides, Jorge; Lopez, Maria Camila Filed By: Werner Enterprises Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.