This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/11/2023 at 04:54:23 (UTC).

Wendt vs Buitta

Case Summary

On 04/29/2022 Wendt filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Buitta. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory W Pollack. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Gregory W Pollack

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wendt, Jacqueline

Defendant

Buitta, Norman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Simon, Joshua G.

610 Newport Center Dr Unit 700

Newport Beach, CA 92660

 

Court Documents

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Wendt, Jacqueline. Refers to: Buitta, Norman

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wendt, Jacqueline. Refers to: Buitta, Norman

Summons

Original Summons filed by Wendt, Jacqueline. Refers to: Buitta, Norman

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Wendt, Jacqueline. Refers to: Buitta, Norman

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default (NOT ENTERED) filed by Wendt, Jacqueline. Refers to: Buitta, Norman

Notice to Filing Party SD

The default filed by was denied. Refers to: Buitta, Norman

Notice of Confirmation of Filing SD

[Another document for ROA# 11]

Request for Entry of Default

E-filing transaction partially accepted.

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by Wendt, Jacqueline. Refers to: Buitta, Norman

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/14/2022 01:30:00 PM.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-71; Event Type: OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • HearingLocation: C-71; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing SD generated.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/14/2022 01:30:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference continued pursuant to party's motion to 02/03/2023 at 01:30PM before Judge Gregory W Pollack.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketOSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed scheduled for 02/03/2023 at 01:30PM before Judge Gregory W Pollack.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketThe default filed by Wendt, Jacqueline was entered as to Buitta, Norman on Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 . Override feature used.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default filed by Wendt, Jacqueline. Refers to: Buitta, Norman; Filed By: Wendt, Jacqueline (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe default filed by was denied. Refers to: Buitta, Norman; Filed By: Wendt, Jacqueline (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default (NOT ENTERED) filed by Wendt, Jacqueline. Refers to: Buitta, Norman; Filed By: Wendt, Jacqueline (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Wendt, Jacqueline. Refers to: Buitta, Norman; Filed By: Wendt, Jacqueline (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/14/2022 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-71 Gregory W Pollack.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Pollack, Gregory.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Wendt, Jacqueline. Refers to: Buitta, Norman; Filed By: Wendt, Jacqueline (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wendt, Jacqueline. Refers to: Buitta, Norman; Filed By: Wendt, Jacqueline (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Wendt, Jacqueline. Refers to: Buitta, Norman; Filed By: Wendt, Jacqueline (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SIMON, JOSHUA GREGORY