This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/30/2021 at 04:09:48 (UTC).

WELLS vs RANCHO PONDEROSA HOMEOWNERS

Case Summary

On 02/01/2021 WELLS filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against RANCHO PONDEROSA HOMEOWNERS. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Timothy M. Casserly and Blaine K. Bowman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************R-NC

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

Timothy M. Casserly

Blaine K. Bowman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Wells, Kenneth L.

Vaiasuso-Wells, Jacqueline

Defendants

Rancho Ponderosa Homeowners Association

Bemus Landscape, Inc.

Curtis Management Company, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Zamoyski, Peter A.

Attorney at GOODE HEMME APC

Defendant Attorneys

Sweet, Wallace H

Taylor, Kenneth O.

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Wells, Kenneth L.; Vaiasuso-Wells, Jacqueline.

Case Management Statement (Case Management)

Case Management Statement filed by Bemus Landscape, Inc..

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Curtis Management Company, Inc.; Rancho Ponderosa Homeowners Association.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 07/09/2021 09:00:00 AM.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Vaiasuso-Wells, Jacqueline; Wells, Kenneth L..

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Wells, Kenneth L.; Vaiasuso-Wells, Jacqueline.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Casserly,Timothy to Bowman,Blaine effective 05/01/2021

Answer to Complaint

Answer filed by Curtis Management Company, Inc.; Rancho Ponderosa Homeowners Association.

Demand for Jury and Notice of Posting Jury Fees

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Curtis Management Company, Inc.; Rancho Ponderosa Homeowners Association.

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by Bemus Landscape, Inc..

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit (Notices)

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Bemus Landscape, Inc..

Proof of Personal Service - Petition

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Wells, Kenneth L.; Vaiasuso-Wells, Jacqueline. Refers to: Rancho Ponderosa Homeowners Association

Proof of Personal Service - Petition

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Wells, Kenneth L.; Vaiasuso-Wells, Jacqueline. Refers to: Curtis Management Company, Inc.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Wells, Kenneth L.; Vaiasuso-Wells, Jacqueline. Refers to: Bemus Landscape, Inc.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Wells, Kenneth L.; Vaiasuso-Wells, Jacqueline. Refers to: Rancho Ponderosa Homeowners Association; Curtis Management Company, Inc.; Bemus Landscape, Inc.

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wells, Kenneth L.; Vaiasuso-Wells, Jacqueline. Refers to: Rancho Ponderosa Homeowners Association; Curtis Management Company, Inc.; Bemus Landscape, Inc.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Wells, Kenneth L.; Vaiasuso-Wells, Jacqueline. Refers to: Rancho Ponderosa Homeowners Association; Curtis Management Company, Inc.; Bemus Landscape, Inc.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Notice of Case Assignment SD generated.

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2022
  • HearingLocation: N-31; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • HearingLocation: N-31; Event Type: Trial Readiness Conference (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Wells, Kenneth L.; Vaiasuso-Wells, Jacqueline. Filed By: Wells, Kenneth L. (Plaintiff); Vaiasuso-Wells, Jacqueline (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Vaiasuso-Wells, Jacqueline; Wells, Kenneth L.. Filed By: Vaiasuso-Wells, Jacqueline (Plaintiff); Wells, Kenneth L. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketPursuant to California Rules of Court 3.714, the Court, after having met and conferred with counsel, categorizes this case as one that will be disposed of within 18 months

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 02/25/2022 at 08:30AM before Judge Blaine K. Bowman.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 02/04/2022 at 10:15AM before Judge Blaine K. Bowman.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketJury demanded by All parties.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketThis matter is referred to Mediation per stipulation of the parties.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 07/09/2021 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Wells, Kenneth L.; Vaiasuso-Wells, Jacqueline. Refers to: Bemus Landscape, Inc. Filed By: Wells, Kenneth L. (Plaintiff); Vaiasuso-Wells, Jacqueline (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/09/2021 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Litigants SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Wells, Kenneth L.; Vaiasuso-Wells, Jacqueline. Refers to: Rancho Ponderosa Homeowners Association; Curtis Management Company, Inc.; Bemus Landscape, Inc. Filed By: Wells, Kenneth L. (Plaintiff); Vaiasuso-Wells, Jacqueline (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wells, Kenneth L.; Vaiasuso-Wells, Jacqueline. Refers to: Rancho Ponderosa Homeowners Association; Curtis Management Company, Inc.; Bemus Landscape, Inc. Filed By: Wells, Kenneth L. (Plaintiff); Vaiasuso-Wells, Jacqueline (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Wells, Kenneth L.; Vaiasuso-Wells, Jacqueline. Refers to: Rancho Ponderosa Homeowners Association; Curtis Management Company, Inc.; Bemus Landscape, Inc. Filed By: Wells, Kenneth L. (Plaintiff); Vaiasuso-Wells, Jacqueline (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Casserly, Timothy.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rancho Ponderosa Homeowners Association is a litigant

Latest cases where Curtis Management Company, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Bemus Landscape, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Zamoyski, Peter A.