This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/24/2018 at 05:46:22 (UTC).

Wells Fargo Financial National Bank vs. Fancher

Case Summary

On 05/07/2012 Wells Fargo Financial National Bank filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Fancher. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, East County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Satisfied.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************L-EC

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Satisfied

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    East County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wells Fargo Financial National Bank

Defendant

Fancher, Darryl

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Quall, Matthew W

Attorney at QUALL CARDOT LLP

401 N Palm Ave

Fresno, CA 93701

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Wells Fargo Financial National Bank.

Satisfaction of Judgment - full

Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed by Wells Fargo Financial National Bank. Refers to: Fancher, Darryl

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Wells Fargo Financial National Bank. Refers to: Fancher, Darryl

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wells Fargo Financial National Bank. Refers to: Fancher, Darryl

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Wells Fargo Financial National Bank. Refers to: Fancher, Darryl

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD

Case initiation form printed.

Statement of Venue

Statement of Venue filed by Wells Fargo Financial National Bank. Refers to: Fancher, Darryl

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Wells Fargo Financial National Bank. Refers to: Fancher, Darryl

Certificate of Service

Certificate of Service filed by Wells Fargo Financial National Bank.

Request for Dismissal of Does

Request for Dismissal of Does filed by Wells Fargo Financial National Bank.

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by Wells Fargo Financial National Bank. Refers to: Fancher, Darryl

Declarations in Support of Application for Default Judgment by Clerk

Declarations in Support of Application for Default Judgment by Clerk filed by Wells Fargo Financial National Bank. Refers to: Fancher, Darryl

Judgment by Default by Clerk

Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by Wells Fargo Financial National Bank. Refers to: Fancher, Darryl

Abstract of Judgment

Abstract of Judgment issued.

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest

Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Wells Fargo Financial National Bank.

Writ

Writ of Execution issued.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Correspondence submitted by Wells Fargo Financial National Bank rejected on 01/17/2014.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Satisfaction of Judgment - full filed by Wells Fargo Financial National Bank. Refers to: Fancher, Darryl Filed By: Wells Fargo Financial National Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Wells Fargo Financial National Bank. Filed By: Wells Fargo Financial National Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Correspondence submitted by Wells Fargo Financial National Bank rejected on 01/17/2014. Filed By: Wells Fargo Financial National Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Execution issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Wells Fargo Financial National Bank. Filed By: Wells Fargo Financial National Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2013
  • *****Writ Received*****

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Abstract of Judgment issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2013
  • ***ABSTRACT RECEIVED***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2012
  • Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for Wells Fargo Financial National Bank and against Fancher, Darryl for $ 3038.47, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 600.00, interest: $ 0.00, prejudgment costs: $ 274.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 3912.47.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by Wells Fargo Financial National Bank. Refers to: Fancher, Darryl Filed By: Wells Fargo Financial National Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 10/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal of Does filed by Wells Fargo Financial National Bank. Filed By: Wells Fargo Financial National Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Service filed by Wells Fargo Financial National Bank. Filed By: Wells Fargo Financial National Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Wells Fargo Financial National Bank. Refers to: Fancher, Darryl Filed By: Wells Fargo Financial National Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Statement of Venue filed by Wells Fargo Financial National Bank. Refers to: Fancher, Darryl Filed By: Wells Fargo Financial National Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2012
  • Case assigned to Department E-21.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2012
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Wells Fargo Financial National Bank. Refers to: Fancher, Darryl Filed By: Wells Fargo Financial National Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wells Fargo Financial National Bank. Refers to: Fancher, Darryl Filed By: Wells Fargo Financial National Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Wells Fargo Financial National Bank. Refers to: Fancher, Darryl Filed By: Wells Fargo Financial National Bank (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.