This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/28/2019 at 02:40:35 (UTC).

Wells Fargo Bank National Association vs. MSK Management Inc

Case Summary

On 08/01/2011 Wells Fargo Bank National Association filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MSK Management Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JACQUELINE M. STERN. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************L-NC

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JACQUELINE M. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Cross Plaintiffs and Defendants

JOSEPH A GALLAGHER III TRUSTEE OF GALLAGHER LIVELY FAMILY TRUST DATED MAY 21 2004

GALLAGHER, JOSEPH A; AKA : GALLAGHER, JOSEPH A III;AKA : GALLAGHLER, JOSEPH;AKA : GALLAGHER, JOE;AKA : GALLAGHER, J A;AKA : GALLAGHER, J

MSK MANAGEMENT INC; DBA : MSK DEVELOPMENT GROUP

JOYCE LIVELY TRUSTEE OF GALLAGHER LIVELY FAMILY TRUST DATED MAY 21 2004

DENISE BUCCOLA TRUSTEE OF PHILIP DENNY BUCCOLA AND DENISE LYNN BUCCOLA FAMILY TRUST DATED JULY 26 1985

BUCCOLA, PHILIP ; AKA : BUCCOLA, PHILIP DENNY;AKA : BUCCOLA, PHILIP D;AKA : BUCCOLA, PHIL;AKA : BUCCOLA, P D

WIKLE, MARTY ; AKA : WIKLE, MARTY L

LIVELY, JOYCE ; AKA : LIVELY, JOYCE L;AKA : GALLAGHER, JOYCE L

PHILIP DENNY BUCCOLA TRUSTEE OF PHILIP DENNY BUCCOLA AND DENISE LYNEE BUCCOLA FAMILY TRUST DATED JULY 26 1985

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

FABOZZI, DENNIS FRANCIS

Attorney at FABOZZI & MILLER APC

41911 Fifth Street Suite 200

Temecula, CA 92590

WUNSCH, JOHN H

Attorney at WELLS FARGO & COMPANY

21680 Gateway Center Dr Suite 280

Diamond Bar, CA 91765

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorneys

GUSTAFSON, CHERYL L

3377 Carmel Mountain Road Ste 250

San Diego, CA 92121

GRANT, MILES D

Attorney at THE GRANT LAW FIRM

1331 India St

San Diego, CA 92101

GIBSON, DIANE H

2755 Jefferson Street 203

Carlsbad, CA 92008

DESCALSO, JUDITH A

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JUDITH A DESCALSO

960 Canterbury Pl Suite 340

Escondido, CA 92025

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 01/19/2017 08:30:00 AM.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Satisfaction of Judgment - Partial (Submitted 1/12/17) submitted by Wells Fargo Bank National Association rejected on 01/26/2017.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Satisfaction of Judgment - Partial (Submitted 1/12/17) submitted by Wells Fargo Bank National Association rejected on 01/26/2017.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for OSC - Sanctions heard 05/30/2017 09:00:00 AM.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for OSC - Sanctions heard 06/05/2017 08:30:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for OSC - Sanctions heard 07/10/2017 09:00:00 AM. (Subsequently amended - See ROA # 620)

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for OSC - Sanctions heard 07/10/2017 09:00:00 AM. (As Amended)

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for OSC - Sanctions heard 07/11/2017 09:00:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 07/25/2017 08:30:00 AM.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 07/25/2017 08:30:00 AM.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

Order

Order (Petition for Writ Denied) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Filing Party SD

The default was denied as to Wikle, Marty on Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank National Association .

Notice to Filing Party - Default SD

The default was denied as to Wikle, Marty on Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank National Association .

Notice of Hearing SD

Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/06/2012 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-27 Jacqueline M. Stern.

Notice of Hearing SD

Settlement Conference (Civil) scheduled for 05/04/2012 at 01:30:00 PM at North County in N-26 Runston G. Maino.

82 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2017
  • DocketJudgment Debtor Exam (Civil) scheduled for 10/20/2017 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-27 Jacqueline M. Stern was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • DocketApplication and Order for Appearance and Examination of Judgment Debtor (10/20) filed by Wells Fargo Bank National Association. Filed By: Wells Fargo Bank National Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • DocketOrder for Appearance and Examination of Judgment Debtor issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • DocketJudgment Debtor Exam (Civil) scheduled for 10/20/2017 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-27 Jacqueline M. Stern.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder (Petition for Writ Denied) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • DocketWrit of Execution Returned - Unsatisfied filed by Wells Fargo Bank National Association. Filed By: Wells Fargo Bank National Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • DocketOrder - Other (Order and Judgment of Contempt) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 07/25/2017 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Ex Parte heard 07/25/2017 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
566 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2011
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Wells Fargo Bank National Association. Refers to: Gallagher, Joseph Filed By: Wells Fargo Bank National Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2011
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Wells Fargo Bank National Association. Refers to: Lively, Joyce Filed By: Wells Fargo Bank National Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2011
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Wells Fargo Bank National Association. Refers to: Joyce Lively Trustee of Gallagher Lively Family Trust dated May 21 2004 Filed By: Wells Fargo Bank National Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2011
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Wells Fargo Bank National Association. Refers to: Joseph A Gallagher III Trustee of Gallagher Lively Family Trust Dated May 21 2004 Filed By: Wells Fargo Bank National Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2011
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Stern, Jacqueline.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2011
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2011
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Wells Fargo Bank National Association. Refers to: MSK Management Inc; Lively, Joyce; Gallagher, Joseph; Wikle, Marty; Buccola, Philip; Joseph A Gallagher III Trustee of Gallagher Lively Family Trust Dated May 21 2004; Joyce Lively Trustee of Gallagher Lively Family Trust dated May 21 2004; Philip Denny Buccola Trustee of Philip Denny Buccola and Denise Lynee Buccola Family Trust dated July 26 1985; Denise Buccola Trustee of Philip Denny Buccola and Denise Lynn Buccola Family Trust dated July 26 1985 Filed By: Wells Fargo Bank National Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2011
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wells Fargo Bank National Association. Refers to: MSK Management Inc; Lively, Joyce; Gallagher, Joseph; Wikle, Marty; Buccola, Philip; Joseph A Gallagher III Trustee of Gallagher Lively Family Trust Dated May 21 2004; Joyce Lively Trustee of Gallagher Lively Family Trust dated May 21 2004; Philip Denny Buccola Trustee of Philip Denny Buccola and Denise Lynee Buccola Family Trust dated July 26 1985; Denise Buccola Trustee of Philip Denny Buccola and Denise Lynn Buccola Family Trust dated July 26 1985 Filed By: Wells Fargo Bank National Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2011
  • DocketComplaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank National Association. Refers to: MSK Management Inc; Lively, Joyce; Gallagher, Joseph; Wikle, Marty; Buccola, Philip; Joseph A Gallagher III Trustee of Gallagher Lively Family Trust Dated May 21 2004; Joyce Lively Trustee of Gallagher Lively Family Trust dated May 21 2004; Philip Denny Buccola Trustee of Philip Denny Buccola and Denise Lynee Buccola Family Trust dated July 26 1985; Denise Buccola Trustee of Philip Denny Buccola and Denise Lynn Buccola Family Trust dated July 26 1985 Filed By: Wells Fargo Bank National Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MSK MANAGEMENT INC; DBA : MSK DEVELOPMENT GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases where Joseph A Paulucci and Patricia M Paulucci Trustees of the Paulucci Family Trust is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FABOZZI, DENNIS F.