This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 12/24/2021 at 06:26:52 (UTC).

Wells Fargo Bank NA vs. Semak

Case Summary

On 05/02/2013 Wells Fargo Bank NA filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Semak. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wells Fargo Bank NA

Defendant

Semak Jr, Joseph T

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Miguel, Christopher A

Attorney at LANG RICHERT & PATCH

Fig Garden Financial Center, 5200 N Palm Ave Suite 110

Fresno, CA 93704

 

Court Documents

Judgment by Default by Clerk

Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Refers to: Semak, Joseph

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default (and Dismissal of Does and Supporting Declarations) filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA.

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Refers to: Semak, Joseph

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Refers to: Semak, Joseph

Certificate of Service

Certificate of Service filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Refers to: Semak, Joseph

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Refers to: Semak, Joseph

Certificate of Service

Certificate of Service filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Refers to: Semak, Joseph

Certificate of Service

Certificate of Service filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Refers to: Semak, Joseph

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Refers to: Semak, Joseph

Certificate of Service

Certificate of Service filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Refers to: Semak, Joseph

Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint (1st) filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Refers to: Semak, Joseph

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD

Case initiation form printed.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Refers to: Semak, Joseph

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Refers to: Semak, Joseph

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Refers to: Semak, Joseph

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Clerk filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Refers to: Semak, Joseph Filed By: Wells Fargo Bank NA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2015
  • DocketJudgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for Wells Fargo Bank NA and against Semak, Joseph T Jr for $ 23976.73, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 800.00, interest: $ 0.00, prejudgment costs: $ 419.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 25195.73.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2014
  • DocketCase reassigned from C-06 to C-07 effective 08/03/2014.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2014
  • Docket*** CLERK'S JUDGMENTS RECEIVED ***

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default (and Dismissal of Does and Supporting Declarations) filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Filed By: Wells Fargo Bank NA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2013
  • DocketCase reassigned from C-05 to C-06 effective 12/07/2013.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Refers to: Semak, Joseph Filed By: Wells Fargo Bank NA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • DocketDefault entered as to Semak, Joseph T Jr on Amended Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Service filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Refers to: Semak, Joseph Filed By: Wells Fargo Bank NA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Service filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Refers to: Semak, Joseph Filed By: Wells Fargo Bank NA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Refers to: Semak, Joseph Filed By: Wells Fargo Bank NA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2013
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint (1st) filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Refers to: Semak, Joseph Filed By: Wells Fargo Bank NA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Refers to: Semak, Joseph Filed By: Wells Fargo Bank NA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Refers to: Semak, Joseph Filed By: Wells Fargo Bank NA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Refers to: Semak, Joseph Filed By: Wells Fargo Bank NA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Refers to: Semak, Joseph Filed By: Wells Fargo Bank NA (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2013
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-05.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less