This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/11/2018 at 08:35:36 (UTC).

Wells Fargo Bank N A vs. Silverado Ranch Inc

Case Summary

On 05/05/2015 Wells Fargo Bank N A filed an Other lawsuit against Silverado Ranch Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JACQUELINE M. STERN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************C-NC

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

JACQUELINE M. STERN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

Wells Fargo Bank N A

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Bacon, Aris Lynn

Dean, Allan B

Samaris LLC; DBA : Samaris Auto Group

Silverado Ranch Inc

Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Wells Fargo Bank N A

Bacon, Aris Lynn

Samaris LLC; DBA : Samaris Auto Group

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

Kipnis, Howard A

Attorney at HICKSON KIPNIS & BARNES LLP

11622 El Camino Real Suite 100

San Diego, CA 92130

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

MCCANN, KEVIN E

2755 Jefferson St #211

Carlsbad, CA 92008

 

Court Documents

Request - Other

Request - Other (Request for Court Judgment) filed by Silverado Ranch Inc; Dean, Allan B. Refers to: Samaris LLC; Bacon, Aris

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (Declaration of Allan B. Dean in Support of Application for Court's Judgment on Default [CCP Section 485(b)]) filed by Silverado Ranch Inc; Dean, Allan B. Refers to: Samaris LLC; Bacon, Aris

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Wells Fargo Bank N A. Refers to: Samaris LLC

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (BY EMAIL) filed by Wells Fargo Bank N A. Refers to: Silverado Ranch Inc; Dean, Allan; Samaris LLC; Bacon, Aris

Application for Order for Publication of Summons/Citation

Application for Order for Publication of Summons/Citation filed by Wells Fargo Bank N A.

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Bacon, Aris Lynn; Samaris LLC.

Answer

Answer filed by Silverado Ranch Inc; Dean, Allan B. Refers to: Wells Fargo Bank N A

Demurrer

Demurrer filed by Wells Fargo Bank N A.

Demurrer

Demurrer (TO X-COMPLAINT 10-2-2015) filed by Silverado Ranch Inc; Dean, Allan B. Refers to: Bacon, Aris

Motion to Strike

Motion to Strike (PORTIONS OF X-COMPLAINT 10-2-2015) filed by Silverado Ranch Inc; Dean, Allan B. Refers to: Bacon, Aris

Notice - Other

Notice - Other (NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF FUNDS ON INTERPLEADER) filed by Wells Fargo Bank N A.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service (PERSONAL SERVICE - NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF FUNDS ON INTERPLEADER) filed by Wells Fargo Bank N A. Refers to: Dean, Allan; Silverado Ranch Inc

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 12/18/2015 01:30:00 PM.

Judgment

Judgment (Judgment Dismissing All Claims Against Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. in Cross-Complaint of Samaris Auto Group, LLC dba Samaris Auto and Aris Lynn Bacon) filed by Wells Fargo Bank N A.

Judgment of Dismissal

Judgment of Dismissal (Judgment of Dismissal Following Demurrer to Cross-Complaint) filed by Silverado Ranch Inc; Dean, Allan B. Refers to: Bacon, Aris

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Wells Fargo Bank N A.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

Order to Appear SD

Order to Appear SD generated.

73 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2016
  • Complaint in Interpleader dismissed without prejudice as to Wells Fargo Bank N A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • Judgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for Dean, Allan B ;Silverado Ranch Inc and against Bacon, Aris Lynn ;Samaris LLC for $ 121265.85, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 0.00, interest: $ 0.00, prejudgment costs: $ 0.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 121265.85.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment (Judgment and Order for Payment from Court Deposit) filed by Dean, Allan B; Silverado Ranch Inc. Filed By: Dean, Allan B (Defendant); Silverado Ranch Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Minutes finalized for Default Prove-Up Hearing heard 12/16/2016 10:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Default Prove-Up Hearing scheduled for 12/16/2016 at 10:30:00 AM at North County in N-27 Jacqueline M. Stern.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request - Other (Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Application for Court Judgment on Default) filed by Silverado Ranch Inc; Dean, Allan B. Refers to: Samaris LLC; Bacon, Aris Filed By: Silverado Ranch Inc (Defendant); Dean, Allan B (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Cause of Actions (Cross-Complaint, Third Cause of Action only) filed by Silverado Ranch Inc; Dean, Allan B. Refers to: Samaris LLC; Bacon, Aris Filed By: Silverado Ranch Inc (Defendant); Dean, Allan B (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request - Other (Application for Entry of of Court's Judgment For Interpled Funds Based on Default) filed by Silverado Ranch Inc; Dean, Allan B. Refers to: Samaris LLC; Bacon, Aris Filed By: Silverado Ranch Inc (Defendant); Dean, Allan B (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Declaration - Other (Declaration of Allan B. Dean in Support of Application for Court's Judgment on Default [CCP Section 485(b)]) filed by Silverado Ranch Inc; Dean, Allan B. Refers to: Samaris LLC; Bacon, Aris Filed By: Silverado Ranch Inc (Defendant); Dean, Allan B (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Request - Other (Request for Court Judgment) filed by Silverado Ranch Inc; Dean, Allan B. Refers to: Samaris LLC; Bacon, Aris Filed By: Silverado Ranch Inc (Defendant); Dean, Allan B (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
106 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Application for Order for Publication of Summons/Citation filed by Wells Fargo Bank N A. Filed By: Wells Fargo Bank N A (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service (BY EMAIL) filed by Wells Fargo Bank N A. Refers to: Silverado Ranch Inc; Dean, Allan; Samaris LLC; Bacon, Aris Filed By: Wells Fargo Bank N A (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Wells Fargo Bank N A. Refers to: Samaris LLC Filed By: Wells Fargo Bank N A (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed by Wells Fargo Bank N A. Refers to: Bacon, Aris Filed By: Wells Fargo Bank N A (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/16/2015 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-27 Jacqueline M. Stern.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Stern, Jacqueline.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wells Fargo Bank N A. Refers to: Silverado Ranch Inc; Dean, Allan; Samaris LLC; Bacon, Aris Filed By: Wells Fargo Bank N A (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint in Interpleader filed by Wells Fargo Bank N A. Refers to: Silverado Ranch Inc; Dean, Allan; Samaris LLC; Bacon, Aris Filed By: Wells Fargo Bank N A (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.