This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/22/2022 at 08:14:13 (UTC).

Weaver vs Amentum Services Inc

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 Weaver filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Amentum Services Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy Taylor. The case status is Other - Transferred.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Timothy Taylor

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

STEPHEN V WEAVER on behalf of all others similarly situated

Weaver, Stephen V

Defendants

AECOM

Amentum Services Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Campbell, Jessica L

9811 Irvine Center Dr Ste 100

Irvine, CA 92618

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Original Summons (Warrants/Issuance Returns)

Original Summons filed by Weaver, Stephen V. Refers to: Amentum Services Inc; AECOM

Civil Case Cover Sheet (Cover Sheets)

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Weaver, Stephen V. Refers to: Amentum Services Inc; AECOM

Complaint (Case Initiation)

Complaint filed by Weaver, Stephen V; STEPHEN V WEAVER on behalf of all others similarly situated. Refers to: Amentum Services Inc; AECOM

Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed by Amentum Services Inc.

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service filed by Weaver, Stephen V; STEPHEN V WEAVER on behalf of all others similarly situated.

Order - Other (Order)

Order - Other (Granting Requst to Dismiss Defendant) filed by Weaver, Stephen V; STEPHEN V WEAVER on behalf of all others similarly situated. Refers to: AECOM

Declaration - Other (Declarations/Affidavits/Statements)

Declaration - Other (in Support of Request for Dismissal) filed by Weaver, Stephen V; STEPHEN V WEAVER on behalf of all others similarly situated.

Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party (Judgment/Dismissal)

Request for Dismissal filed by Weaver, Stephen V; STEPHEN V WEAVER on behalf of all others similarly situated. Refers to: AECOM

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-72; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Removal to Federal Court filed by Amentum Services Inc. Filed By: Amentum Services Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketComplaint dismissed without prejudice as to AECOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal filed by Weaver, Stephen V; STEPHEN V WEAVER on behalf of all others similarly situated. Refers to: AECOM Filed By: Weaver, Stephen V (Plaintiff); STEPHEN V WEAVER on behalf of all others similarly situated (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (in Support of Request for Dismissal) filed by Weaver, Stephen V; STEPHEN V WEAVER on behalf of all others similarly situated. Filed By: Weaver, Stephen V (Plaintiff); STEPHEN V WEAVER on behalf of all others similarly situated (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (Granting Requst to Dismiss Defendant) filed by Weaver, Stephen V; STEPHEN V WEAVER on behalf of all others similarly situated. Refers to: AECOM Filed By: Weaver, Stephen V (Plaintiff); STEPHEN V WEAVER on behalf of all others similarly situated (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Weaver, Stephen V; STEPHEN V WEAVER on behalf of all others similarly situated. Filed By: Weaver, Stephen V (Plaintiff); STEPHEN V WEAVER on behalf of all others similarly situated (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 04/29/2022 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Weaver, Stephen V; STEPHEN V WEAVER on behalf of all others similarly situated. Refers to: Amentum Services Inc; AECOM Filed By: Weaver, Stephen V (Plaintiff); STEPHEN V WEAVER on behalf of all others similarly situated (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Weaver, Stephen V. Refers to: Amentum Services Inc; AECOM Filed By: Weaver, Stephen V (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Weaver, Stephen V. Refers to: Amentum Services Inc; AECOM Filed By: Weaver, Stephen V (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Taylor, Timothy.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Amentum Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where AECOM is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Campbell, Jessica L.