This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/09/2022 at 00:08:17 (UTC).

WBC DRYWALL INC vs AYRES GROUP

Case Summary

On 07/09/2019 WBC DRYWALL INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AYRES GROUP. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy Taylor. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Timothy Taylor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

WBC DRYWALL INC

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

AYRES GROUP

D'ELISCU, BRUCE

SURETEC INDEMNITY COMPANY

AYRES-MILLENIA L P

D'ELISCU, BRUCE ; DBA : Ayres Alberghi LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

Parkman, Sharmila

Attorney at THE PARKMAN LAW FIRM

9845 Erma Rd #210B

San Diego, CA 92131

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Sitzer, Michael F

Attorney at SITZER LAW GROUP PC

430 32Nd St Suite 200

Newport Beach, CA 92663

Gascou, Christian

Attorney at GASCOU HOPKINS LLP

9696 Culver Boulevard 302

Culver City, CA 90232

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by AYRES GROUP; AYRES-MILLENIA L P; WBC DRYWALL INC.

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

General Denial

General Denial (WITH POS) filed by D'ELISCU, BRUCE.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by WBC DRYWALL INC.

Declaration of Sharmila R Parkman Regarding Meet and Confer for Discovery Response of Defendants D'Eliscu and Ayres Millenia

Declaration - Other (of Sharmila R. Parkman) filed by WBC DRYWALL INC.

Notice of Informal Discovery Conference

Informal Discovery Conference Brief filed by WBC DRYWALL INC.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Informal Discovery Conference (Civil) heard 01/06/2022 08:30:00 AM.

Declaration of Michael F. Sitzer, Esq.

Declaration - Other filed by AYRES GROUP; AYRES-MILLENIA L P; D'ELISCU, BRUCE.

Notice of Court's Minute Order on Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint

Notice - Other (of courts minute order on plaintiffs motion) filed by AYRES GROUP; AYRES-MILLENIA L P.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Multiple Events heard 10/15/2021 01:30:00 PM.

Reply (Opposition & Replies)

Reply filed by AYRES GROUP.

Tentative Rulings

Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.

WBC Drywall, Inc.'s Reply

Reply to Opposition - Other filed by WBC DRYWALL INC.

75 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by AYRES GROUP; AYRES-MILLENIA L P; WBC DRYWALL INC.; Filed By: AYRES GROUP (Cross - Complainant); AYRES-MILLENIA L P (Cross - Complainant); WBC DRYWALL INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to WBC DRYWALL INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to SURETEC INDEMNITY COMPANY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to D'ELISCU, BRUCE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to AYRES-MILLENIA L P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketComplaint dismissed with prejudice as to AYRES GROUP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketCross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to WBC DRYWALL INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketCross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to AYRES-MILLENIA L P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketCross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to AYRES GROUP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 06/24/2022 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
107 More Docket Entries
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (As to Summons Complaint and Civil Case Cover Sheet. - Ayres Group, Donald B. Ayres - Authorized to Accept) filed by WBC DRYWALL INC. Refers to: AYRES GROUP; Filed By: WBC DRYWALL INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (As to summons complaint and civil case cover sheet Suretec Indemnity Company - Gabriela Sanchez - Person Authorized to Accept) filed by WBC DRYWALL INC. Refers to: AYRES GROUP; Filed By: WBC DRYWALL INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Pendency of Action filed by WBC DRYWALL INC.; Filed By: WBC DRYWALL INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 12/13/2019 at 09:15:00 AM at Central in C-72 Timothy Taylor.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Taylor, Timothy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by WBC DRYWALL INC. Refers to: AYRES GROUP; AYRES-MILLENIA L P; D'ELISCU, BRUCE; SURETEC INDEMNITY COMPANY; Filed By: WBC DRYWALL INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by WBC DRYWALL INC. Refers to: AYRES GROUP; AYRES-MILLENIA L P; D'ELISCU, BRUCE; SURETEC INDEMNITY COMPANY; Filed By: WBC DRYWALL INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by WBC DRYWALL INC. Refers to: AYRES GROUP; AYRES-MILLENIA L P; D'ELISCU, BRUCE; SURETEC INDEMNITY COMPANY; Filed By: WBC DRYWALL INC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SURETEC INDEMNITY COMPANY A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARKMAN SHARMILA ROY