This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/01/2022 at 07:05:47 (UTC).

Wawanesa General Insurance Company vs Woods

Case Summary

On 11/02/2021 Wawanesa General Insurance Company filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Woods. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Eddie C Sturgeon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Eddie C Sturgeon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wawanesa General Insurance Company

Defendant

Woods, Bonnie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAMS, JASON P

3170 Fourth Avenue 400

San Diego, CA 92103

Defendant Attorney

LANE, DOMINICK V

First National Bank Center, 401 W A St

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Wawanesa General Insurance Company. Refers to: Woods, Bonnie

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wawanesa General Insurance Company. Refers to: Woods, Bonnie

Complaint

Complaint filed by Wawanesa General Insurance Company. Refers to: Woods, Bonnie

Answer

Answer filed by Woods, Bonnie.

Proof of Service - Certified Mail - Out of State

Proof of Service - Certified Mail - Out of State filed by Wawanesa General Insurance Company. Refers to: Woods, Bonnie

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-67; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Woods, Bonnie. Filed By: Woods, Bonnie (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service - Certified Mail - Out of State filed by Wawanesa General Insurance Company. Refers to: Woods, Bonnie Filed By: Wawanesa General Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/07/2022 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-67 Eddie C Sturgeon.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Wawanesa General Insurance Company. Refers to: Woods, Bonnie Filed By: Wawanesa General Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wawanesa General Insurance Company. Refers to: Woods, Bonnie Filed By: Wawanesa General Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Wawanesa General Insurance Company. Refers to: Woods, Bonnie Filed By: Wawanesa General Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Sturgeon, Eddie.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WAWANESA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LANE DOMINICK ESQ.