This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 08/03/2022 at 08:04:12 (UTC).

Wawanesa General Insurance Company vs Home Depot USA Inc

Case Summary

On 05/05/2022 Wawanesa General Insurance Company filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Home Depot USA Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew C. Braner. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Matthew C. Braner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wawanesa General Insurance Company

Defendants

Home Depot USA Inc

Rheem Manufacturing Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Williams, Jason P.

3170 Fourth Ave #4Th

San Diego, CA 92103

Defendant Attorney

Dixon, Robert K

Attorney at SANDERS ROBERTS LLP

1055 W 7Th St Suite 3200

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2557

 

Court Documents

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000

Complaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Wawanesa General Insurance Company. Refers to: Home Depot USA Inc; Rheem Manufacturing Company

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wawanesa General Insurance Company. Refers to: Home Depot USA Inc; Rheem Manufacturing Company

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Wawanesa General Insurance Company. Refers to: Home Depot USA Inc; Rheem Manufacturing Company

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Answer

Answer filed by Home Depot USA Inc.

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD

Notice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

Notice of Settlement

Notice of Unconditional Settlement filed by Wawanesa General Insurance Company.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Wawanesa General Insurance Company.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Wawanesa General Insurance Company.; Filed By: Wawanesa General Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed with prejudice as to Wawanesa General Insurance Company.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed with prejudice as to Rheem Manufacturing Company.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 dismissed with prejudice as to Home Depot USA Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Dismissal by Court SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/14/2022 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-60 Matthew C. Braner was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Unconditional Settlement filed by Wawanesa General Insurance Company.; Filed By: Wawanesa General Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Home Depot USA Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/14/2022 at 10:30:00 AM at Central in C-60 Matthew C. Braner.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Braner, Matthew.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Wawanesa General Insurance Company. Refers to: Home Depot USA Inc; Rheem Manufacturing Company; Filed By: Wawanesa General Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wawanesa General Insurance Company. Refers to: Home Depot USA Inc; Rheem Manufacturing Company; Filed By: Wawanesa General Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding Less than $10,000 filed by Wawanesa General Insurance Company. Refers to: Home Depot USA Inc; Rheem Manufacturing Company; Filed By: Wawanesa General Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RHEEM MANUFACTURING COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where WAWANESA GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLIAMS, JASON P