This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/29/2021 at 03:41:29 (UTC).

Ward vs Ameri

Case Summary

On 12/15/2020 Ward filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Ameri. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judges overseeing this case are James A Mangione and Richard E. L. Strauss. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judges

James A Mangione

Richard E. L. Strauss

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ward, Christina Bird

Defendant

Ameri, Shadi ; AKA : Amerihosseini, Shadi

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THEIS, BRYAN K

 

Court Documents

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Ward, Christina Bird. Refers to: Ameri, Shadi

Civil Case Cover Sheet

[A document for ROA# 2]

Complaint

[A document for ROA# 1]

Answer

Answer filed by Ameri, Shadi.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Case reassigned from Strauss,Richard to Mangione,James effective 10/30/2021

Order to Show Cause (Non-Sanctions) SD

Order to Show Cause (Non-Sanctions) SD generated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/22/2021 10:00:00 AM.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2021
  • HearingLocation: C-75; Event Type: OSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2021
  • DocketOSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed reassigned to Mangione, James for 12/03/2021 at 10:45:00 AM in C-75 at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase reassigned from Strauss,Richard to Mangione,James effective 10/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketOSC - Why Case Should Not be Dismissed scheduled for 12/03/2021 at 10:45AM before Judge Richard E. L. Strauss.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/22/2021 10:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Non-Sanctions) SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Ameri, Shadi. Filed By: Ameri, Shadi (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/22/2021 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-75 Richard E. L. Strauss.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Ward, Christina Bird. Refers to: Ameri, Shadi Filed By: Ward, Christina Bird (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Ward, Christina Bird. Refers to: Ameri, Shadi Filed By: Ward, Christina Bird (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Ward, Christina Bird. Refers to: Ameri, Shadi Filed By: Ward, Christina Bird (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Strauss, Richard.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer THEIS BRYAN KENTON