This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/23/2022 at 03:56:03 (UTC).

Wanke Industrial Commercial Residential Inc vs Purcell

Case Summary

On 02/27/2018 Wanke Industrial Commercial Residential Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Purcell. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RANDA TRAPP. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

RANDA TRAPP

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WANKE INDUSTRIAL COMMERCIAL RESIDENTIAL INC

Defendant

PURCELL, SUSAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LINDBORG, PETER F

Defendant Attorney

HAHN, RODNEY J

864 Grand Avenue 852

San Diego, CA 92109

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (Not Entered) filed by Wanke Industrial Commercial Residential Inc.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Wanke Industrial Commercial Residential Inc.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Wanke Industrial Commercial Residential Inc.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Purcell, Susan.

Notice of Hearing SD

Settlement Conference (Civil) scheduled for 11/16/2018 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in 2202 Jay M. Bloom.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 10/26/2018 10:10:00 AM.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Purcell, Susan.

Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD

The Settlement Conference (Civil) was rescheduled to 11/16/2018 at 09:00:00 AM in 2202 before Jay M. Bloom at Central.

Brief - Other

Brief - Other (VOLUNTARY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BRIEF OF DEFENDANT SUSAN PURCELL) filed by HAHN, RODNEY J.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Settlement Conference (Civil) heard 11/16/2018 09:00:00 AM.

Order - Other

Order - Other (STIPULATION AND ORDER) filed by HAHN, RODNEY J; Wanke Industrial Commercial Residential Inc.

Answer

Answer filed by Purcell, Susan.

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Wanke Industrial Commercial Residential Inc. Refers to: Purcell, Susan

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wanke Industrial Commercial Residential Inc. Refers to: Purcell, Susan

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Wanke Industrial Commercial Residential Inc. Refers to: Purcell, Susan

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketComplaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed with prejudice as to Purcell, Susan .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • DocketComplaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 dismissed with prejudice as to Wanke Industrial Commercial Residential Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Wanke Industrial Commercial Residential Inc. Filed By: Wanke Industrial Commercial Residential Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action (Not Entered) filed by Wanke Industrial Commercial Residential Inc. Filed By: Wanke Industrial Commercial Residential Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Settlement Conference (Civil) heard 11/16/2018 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 01/25/2019 at 08:45:00 AM at Central in C-70 Randa Trapp was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 01/11/2019 at 09:00:00 AM at Central in C-70 Randa Trapp was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (STIPULATION AND ORDER) filed by HAHN, RODNEY J; Wanke Industrial Commercial Residential Inc. Filed By: HAHN, RODNEY J (Attorney); Wanke Industrial Commercial Residential Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBrief - Other (VOLUNTARY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE BRIEF OF DEFENDANT SUSAN PURCELL) filed by HAHN, RODNEY J. Filed By: HAHN, RODNEY J (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketThe Settlement Conference (Civil) was rescheduled to 11/16/2018 at 09:00:00 AM in 2202 before Jay M. Bloom at Central.

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Purcell, Susan. Filed By: Purcell, Susan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase Management Statement filed by Wanke Industrial Commercial Residential Inc. Filed By: Wanke Industrial Commercial Residential Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Purcell, Susan. Filed By: Purcell, Susan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/26/2018 at 10:10:00 AM at Central in C-70 Randa Trapp.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Wanke Industrial Commercial Residential Inc. Refers to: Purcell, Susan Filed By: Wanke Industrial Commercial Residential Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wanke Industrial Commercial Residential Inc. Refers to: Purcell, Susan Filed By: Wanke Industrial Commercial Residential Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Wanke Industrial Commercial Residential Inc. Refers to: Purcell, Susan Filed By: Wanke Industrial Commercial Residential Inc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Trapp, Randa.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WANKE INDUSTRIAL COMMERCIAL RESIDENTIAL INC. is a litigant