This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/07/2018 at 23:13:46 (UTC).

Wang vs. Goetz

Case Summary

On 06/25/2014 Wang filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Goetz. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TIMOTHY M. CASSERLY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************L-NC

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

TIMOTHY M. CASSERLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Wang, Yang

Goetz, Robert E

HAYES, CHARLIE

TEE STORE INC

Defendant, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

Goetz, Robert E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, Cross Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Greenbaum, Martin B

Attorney at GREENBAUM LAW GROUP LLP

170 Newport Center Drive 130

Newport Beach, CA 92660

ALEXANDER, BRIAN D

6165 Greenwich Dr #340

San Diego, CA 92122

DACK, MARTIN E

20 Pacifica

Irvine, CA 92618

FRIEDLAND, TODD G

Cross Defendant, Cross Plaintiff and Defendant Attorney

ALEXANDER, BRIAN D

6165 Greenwich Dr #340

San Diego, CA 92122

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wang, Yang. Refers to: Goetz, Robert

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Wang, Yang. Refers to: Goetz, Robert

Answer

Answer filed by Goetz, Robert E.

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by Goetz, Robert E. Refers to: Hayes, Charlie; Tee Store Inc; Wang, Yang

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Goetz, Robert E. Refers to: Hayes, Charlie

Motion to Strike

Motion to Strike (1/23/15) filed by Tee Store Inc.

Order - Other

Order - Other filed by Tee Store Inc.

Order - Other

Order - Other submitted by Hayes, Charlie received but not filed on 10/14/2014.

Answer

Answer filed by Goetz, Robert E.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Goetz, Robert E.

Notice of Intent to Appear Telephonically

Notice of Intent to Appear Telephonically filed by Hayes, Charlie.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Goetz, Robert E.

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents

Ex Parte Application - Other and Supporting Documents (1/29/15) filed by Goetz, Robert E.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Goetz, Robert E.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Tee Store Inc.

Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail filed by Goetz, Robert E.

Answer

Answer filed by Tee Store Inc.

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Goetz, Robert E. Refers to: Wang, Yang; Tee Store Inc

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation - Other - Fee Due filed by Tee Store Inc. Filed By: Tee Store Inc (Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/24/2015 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Wang, Yang .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2015
  • Complaint dismissed without prejudice as to Goetz, Robert E .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Amended Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Goetz, Robert E .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Amended Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Wang, Yang .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • Amended Cross-Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Tee Store Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Goetz, Robert E. Refers to: Wang, Yang; Tee Store Inc Filed By: Goetz, Robert E (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service by Mail filed by Wang, Yang. Filed By: Wang, Yang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Rescheduled Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Cross-Complaint filed by Goetz, Robert E. Refers to: Hayes, Charlie; Tee Store Inc; Wang, Yang Filed By: Goetz, Robert E (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer filed by Goetz, Robert E. Filed By: Goetz, Robert E (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed by Wang, Yang. Refers to: Goetz, Robert Filed By: Wang, Yang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 03/27/2015 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Casserly, Timothy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2014
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Wang, Yang. Refers to: Goetz, Robert Filed By: Wang, Yang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Wang, Yang. Refers to: Goetz, Robert Filed By: Wang, Yang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Wang, Yang. Refers to: Goetz, Robert Filed By: Wang, Yang (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.