This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/16/2018 at 22:11:03 (UTC).

Walters Wholesale Electric Co vs. Gould Electric, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/03/2017 Walters Wholesale Electric Co filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Gould Electric, Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TIMOTHY M. CASSERLY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************C-NC

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    North County Regional Center

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

TIMOTHY M. CASSERLY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WALTERS WHOLESALE ELECTRIC CO

Defendants

FARMINGTON CASUALTY COMPANY

GOULD ELECTRIC, INC.

TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA

MCCARTHY BUILDING COMPANIES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPLINTER, ROBERT GEORGE

25124 Narbonne Ave

Lomita, CA 90717

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action

Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Walters Wholesale Electric Co. Refers to: Gould Electric, Inc.; McCarthy Building Companies, Inc.; Farmington Casualty Company; Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America

Complaint

Complaint filed by Walters Wholesale Electric Co. Refers to: Gould Electric, Inc.; McCarthy Building Companies, Inc.; Farmington Casualty Company; Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Walters Wholesale Electric Co. Refers to: Gould Electric, Inc.; McCarthy Building Companies, Inc.; Farmington Casualty Company; Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Walters Wholesale Electric Co. Refers to: Gould Electric, Inc.; McCarthy Building Companies, Inc.; Farmington Casualty Company; Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2017
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/06/2017 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly was vacated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Walters Wholesale Electric Co.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Farmington Casualty Company.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to McCarthy Building Companies, Inc..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Complaint dismissed with prejudice as to Gould Electric, Inc..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Walters Wholesale Electric Co. Refers to: Gould Electric, Inc.; McCarthy Building Companies, Inc.; Farmington Casualty Company; Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America Filed By: Walters Wholesale Electric Co (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Case initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Civil Case Management Conference scheduled for 10/06/2017 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-31 Timothy M. Casserly.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • Case assigned to Judicial Officer Casserly, Timothy.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Summons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Original Summons filed by Walters Wholesale Electric Co. Refers to: Gould Electric, Inc.; McCarthy Building Companies, Inc.; Farmington Casualty Company; Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America Filed By: Walters Wholesale Electric Co (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Walters Wholesale Electric Co. Refers to: Gould Electric, Inc.; McCarthy Building Companies, Inc.; Farmington Casualty Company; Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America Filed By: Walters Wholesale Electric Co (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint filed by Walters Wholesale Electric Co. Refers to: Gould Electric, Inc.; McCarthy Building Companies, Inc.; Farmington Casualty Company; Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America Filed By: Walters Wholesale Electric Co (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GOULD ELECTRIC is a litigant

Latest cases where Farmington Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases where MCCARTHY BUILDING COMPANIES INC. A MISSOURI CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where WALTERS WHOLESALE ELECTRIC CO. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant