This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 01/09/2023 at 03:34:51 (UTC).

WALKER vs SIMA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 01/11/2022 WALKER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SIMA CORPORATION. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cynthia A. Freeland. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************O-NC

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Cynthia A. Freeland

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Walker, Patricia

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Ames, Jerimiah ; DBA : Crest Construction

Crest Construction

SIMA MANAGEMENT CORP; ESA : SIMA CORPORATION

Cross Plaintiff and Defendant

SIMA MANAGEMENT CORP; ESA : SIMA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Miller, Zachary

Attorney at MILLER & STEELE LAW FIRM

5650 El Camino Real Suite 103

Carlsbad, CA 92008

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

SKANE, ELIZABETH A

600 B St Unit 1500

San Diego, CA 92101

Norris, Suzanne T

Attorney at One Pointe Drive

1 Pointe Drive 6Th Floor

Brea, CA 92821

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Norris, Suzanne T

Attorney at One Pointe Drive

1 Pointe Drive 6Th Floor

Brea, CA 92821

 

Court Documents

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Walker, Patricia.

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service filed by Ames, Jerimiah.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit (Notices)

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Ames, Jerimiah.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 08/05/2022 09:00:00 AM.

Notice of Case Reassignment SD

Notice of Case Reassignment SD generated.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by Walker, Patricia.

Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement filed by SIMA MANAGEMENT CORP.

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service filed by Ames, Jerimiah.

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by Ames, Jerimiah.

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service filed by Ames, Jerimiah.

Case Management Statement (Case Management)

Case Management Statement (8/05/22) filed by Ames, Jerimiah.

Answer (First Papers)

Answer filed by Ames, Jerimiah.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by SIMA MANAGEMENT CORP. Refers to: Ames, Jerimiah

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by SIMA MANAGEMENT CORP. Refers to: Crest Construction

Summons Cross-Complaint

Original Summons filed by SIMA MANAGEMENT CORP. Refers to: Crest Construction; Ames, Jerimiah

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by SIMA MANAGEMENT CORP. Refers to: Ames, Jerimiah; Crest Construction

NOTICE OF CONSENT TO ELECTRONIC SERVICE AND NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE ADDRESSES

Consent to Electronic Service and Notice of Electronic Service Address filed by SIMA MANAGEMENT CORP.

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2023
  • HearingLocation: N-27; Event Type: Civil Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2023
  • HearingLocation: N-27; Event Type: Trial Readiness Conference (Civil)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Walker, Patricia.; Filed By: Walker, Patricia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Ames, Jerimiah.; Filed By: Ames, Jerimiah (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Jury Fee Deposit filed by Ames, Jerimiah.; Filed By: Ames, Jerimiah (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Civil Case Management Conference heard 08/05/2022 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketJury demanded by all parties.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketCivil Jury Trial scheduled for 09/08/2023 at 08:30AM before Judge Cynthia A. Freeland.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketTrial Readiness Conference (Civil) scheduled for 08/18/2023 at 10:00AM before Judge Cynthia A. Freeland.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketPursuant to California Rules of Court 3.714, the Court, after having met and conferred with counsel, categorizes this case as one that will be disposed of within 18 months

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by HOWARD & CHARLES, INC./THE HARTFORD.; Filed By: HOWARD & CHARLES, INC./THE HARTFORD (Lien Claimant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Lien filed by HOWARD & CHARLES, INC./THE HARTFORD.; Filed By: HOWARD & CHARLES, INC./THE HARTFORD (Lien Claimant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/01/2022 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-31 Blaine K. Bowman.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Bowman, Blaine.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Walker, Patricia. Refers to: SIMA MANAGEMENT CORP; Ames, Jerimiah; Crest Construction; Filed By: Walker, Patricia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Walker, Patricia. Refers to: SIMA MANAGEMENT CORP; Ames, Jerimiah; Crest Construction; Filed By: Walker, Patricia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Walker, Patricia. Refers to: SIMA MANAGEMENT CORP; Ames, Jerimiah; Crest Construction; Filed By: Walker, Patricia (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less