This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 02/18/2021 at 04:22:28 (UTC).

Wales Vs Qantas Airways Ltd

Case Summary

On 05/26/2020 Wales filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Qantas Airways Ltd. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Wales, Cameron

Wales, Sydney

Defendants

Qntas Airways Ltd

Qantas Airways Ltd

 

Court Documents

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) SD

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) SD generated.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Small Claims Court Trial heard 01/13/2021 01:30:00 PM.

Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Personal

Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Personal filed by Wales, Cameron; Wales, Sydney. Refers to: Qantas Airways Ltd

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number

Notice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Wales, Sydney; Wales, Cameron.

Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Personal

Proof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Personal filed by Wales, Cameron; Wales, Sydney. Refers to: Qantas Airways Ltd

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD generated.

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Wales, Sydney; Wales, Cameron. Refers to: Qantas Airways Ltd

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketThe Court finds judgment on the Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court for Sydney Wales, Cameron Wales and against Qantas Airways Ltd in the amount of: $6033.74 principal, $174.00 costs, $0 pre-judgment interest.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Small Claims Court Trial heard 01/13/2021 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Personal filed by Wales, Cameron; Wales, Sydney. Refers to: Qantas Airways Ltd Filed By: Wales, Cameron (Plaintiff); Wales, Sydney (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of Claim and Order to Defendant - Personal filed by Wales, Cameron; Wales, Sydney. Refers to: Qantas Airways Ltd Filed By: Wales, Cameron (Plaintiff); Wales, Sydney (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Change of Address / Telephone Number filed by Wales, Sydney; Wales, Cameron. Filed By: Wales, Sydney (Plaintiff); Wales, Cameron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial scheduled for 01/13/2021 at 01:30:00 PM at Central in C-62 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Wales, Sydney; Wales, Cameron. Refers to: Qantas Airways Ltd Filed By: Wales, Sydney (Plaintiff); Wales, Cameron (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-63.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Qntas Airways Ltd is a litigant