This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 11/26/2021 at 07:19:49 (UTC).

Vue Audiotechnik LLC vs Berger

Case Summary

On 09/27/2021 Vue Audiotechnik LLC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against Berger. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cynthia A. Freeland. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************T-NC

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Cynthia A. Freeland

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vue Audiotechnik LLC

Defendants

Berger, Kenneth

Facebook Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Altona, Erick R

Kiamilev, Chandra E.

 

Court Documents

Tentative Rulings

Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.

Proof of Service of Amended OSC

Proof of Service filed by Vue Audiotechnik LLC.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 11/05/2021 01:30:00 PM.

Order - Other

Order - Other (Amended Order to Show Cause) filed by The Superior Court of San Diego.

Amended Declaration of Richard Cruz ISO OSC re Prelim Injunc

Declaration - Other filed by Vue Audiotechnik LLC.

Amended Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Vue Audiotechnik LLC; Vue Audiotechnik LLC.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Vue Audiotechnik LLC; Vue Audiotechnik LLC.

Tentative Rulings

Tentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.

Minute Order

Minutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 11/12/2021 01:30:00 PM.

Notice of Non-Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction

Notice - Other filed by Vue Audiotechnik LLC.

Declaration of Richard Payne

Declaration - Other filed by Vue Audiotechnik LLC; Vue Audiotechnik LLC.

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Vue Audiotechnik LLC; Vue Audiotechnik LLC.

Proposed Order and preliminary injunction

Proposed Order (11/05/21) submitted by Vue Audiotechnik LLC received but not filed on 10/12/2021.

Notice of Entry of Order on TRO

Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by Vue Audiotechnik LLC.

Notice of Motion for Preliminary Injunction

Notice - Other (Notice of Motion for Preliminary Injunction) filed by Vue Audiotechnik LLC.

Proposed Order to Show Cause

Order - Other (to Show Cause) filed by Vue Audiotechnik LLC.

Notice of Motion and Supporting Declarations

Motion for Preliminary Injunction (11/5/2021) filed by Vue Audiotechnik LLC.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (11/5/2021) filed by Vue Audiotechnik LLC.

28 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/05/2022
  • HearingLocation: N-27; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • HearingLocation: N-27; Event Type: Motion Hearing (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) continued pursuant to Court's motion to 12/03/2021 at 01:30PM before Judge Cynthia A. Freeland.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes finalized for Motion Hearing (Civil) heard 11/12/2021 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTentative Ruling for Motion Hearing (Civil) published.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other filed by Vue Audiotechnik LLC. Filed By: Vue Audiotechnik LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Vue Audiotechnik LLC; Vue Audiotechnik LLC. Filed By: Vue Audiotechnik LLC (Plaintiff); Vue Audiotechnik LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Vue Audiotechnik LLC; Vue Audiotechnik LLC. Filed By: Vue Audiotechnik LLC (Plaintiff); Vue Audiotechnik LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Vue Audiotechnik LLC. Filed By: Vue Audiotechnik LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketMotion Hearing (Civil) continued pursuant to party's motion to 11/12/2021 at 01:30PM before Judge Cynthia A. Freeland.

    Read MoreRead Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Vue Audiotechnik LLC; Vue Audiotechnik LLC. Filed By: Vue Audiotechnik LLC (Plaintiff); Vue Audiotechnik LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketEx Parte scheduled for 10/12/2021 at 08:30:00 AM at North County in N-27 Cynthia A. Freeland.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Vue Audiotechnik LLC. Refers to: Berger, Kenneth Filed By: Vue Audiotechnik LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/05/2022 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-27 Cynthia A. Freeland.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Vue Audiotechnik LLC. Refers to: Berger, Kenneth; Facebook Inc Filed By: Vue Audiotechnik LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Vue Audiotechnik LLC. Refers to: Berger, Kenneth; Facebook Inc Filed By: Vue Audiotechnik LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Vue Audiotechnik LLC. Refers to: Berger, Kenneth; Facebook Inc Filed By: Vue Audiotechnik LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Freeland, Cynthia.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Facebook is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kiamilev, Chandra

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Altona, Erick R