This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 03/29/2022 at 04:01:03 (UTC).

Volcimus vs George

Case Summary

On 03/01/2022 Volcimus filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against George. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The case status is Pending - Trial.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Trial

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Volcimus, Alix

San Diego, CA 92102

Defendant

George, ; DBA : Excellence Service & Towing Inc

 

Court Documents

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

Notice of Hearing SD

Notice of Hearing SD generated.

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD

Notice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD generated.

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Volcimus, Alix. Refers to: George

Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Granted in whole) filed by Volcimus, Alix.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-63; Event Type: Small Claims Court Trial - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment Small Claims SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • DocketSmall Claims Court Trial scheduled for 06/06/2022 at 08:30:00 AM at Central in C-63 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Granted in whole) filed by Volcimus, Alix.; Filed By: Volcimus, Alix (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Volcimus, Alix.; Filed By: Volcimus, Alix (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Department C-63.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Small Claims Court filed by Volcimus, Alix. Refers to: George; Filed By: Volcimus, Alix (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Law Offices of George A Gallegos is a litigant