This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/04/2020 at 02:28:15 (UTC).

Voice of San Diego vs San Diego State University

Case Summary

On 02/15/2019 Voice of San Diego filed an Other lawsuit against San Diego State University. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronald L. Styn. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Ronald L. Styn

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Voice of San Diego

Respondents

San Diego State University

The Board of Trustees of the California State University

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Tinkov, Felix M

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF FELIX TINKOV

401 W A St Suite 1900

San Diego, CA 92101

BARRAD, CATHERINE VALERIO

401 Golden Shore

Long Beach, CA 90802

Respondent Attorney

O'Brien, Anthony P

Attorney at DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL

1300 I Street 125

Sacramento, CA 95814-2550

 

Court Documents

Correspondence

Correspondence (Correspondence Re: Proposed Judgment and Proposed Order) filed by The Board of Trustees of the California State University.

Order - Other

Order - Other (Order Denying the Amended Verified Petition for Writ of Mandate to Compel Compliance with Public Records Act and Complaint for Declaratory and Preliminary and Permanent Injunction - (Signed)) filed by The Board of Trustees of the California State University.

Judgment

Judgment ((Signed)) filed by The Board of Trustees of the California State University. Refers to: Voice of San Diego

Notice of Entry of Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by The Board of Trustees of the California State University.

Notice of Entry of Judgment

Notice of Entry of Judgment filed by The Board of Trustees of the California State University.

Notice of Lodgment

Notice of Lodgment (Re: Documents Submitted Conditionally Under Seal - Binder 1) filed by The Board of Trustees of the California State University.

Notice of Lodgment

Notice of Lodgment (Re: Documents Submitted Conditionally Under Seal - Binder 2) filed by The Board of Trustees of the California State University.

Notice of Lodgment

Notice of Lodgment (Re: Documents Submitted Conditionally Under Seal - Binder 3) filed by The Board of Trustees of the California State University.

Notice of Lodgment

Notice of Lodgment (Re: Documents Submitted Conditionally Under Seal - Binder 4) filed by The Board of Trustees of the California State University.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail SD generated.

Supplemental Brief RE Use of Exemption Under Govenment Code 6254 subdivision (H)

Brief - Other (Supplemental Brief RE Use of Exemption Under Govenment Code 6254 subdivision (H)) filed by The Board of Trustees of the California State University.

of Thomas McCarron in Support of Board of Trustrees of the California State University's Further Supplementa Brief

Declaration - Other (of Thomas McCarron in Support of Board of Trustrees of the California State University's Further Supplementa Brief) filed by The Board of Trustees of the California State University.

Minute Order

Miscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.

Brief - Other

Brief - Other (Respondent Board of Trustees of the California State University's Supplemental Brief Regarding Use of Exemption Under Government Code Section 6254, Subd. (H)) filed by The Board of Trustees of the California State University.

Declaration - Other

Declaration - Other (of Anthony P. O'Brien) filed by The Board of Trustees of the California State University.

52 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment filed by The Board of Trustees of the California State University. Filed By: The Board of Trustees of the California State University (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment filed by The Board of Trustees of the California State University. Filed By: The Board of Trustees of the California State University (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder - Other (Order Denying the Amended Verified Petition for Writ of Mandate to Compel Compliance with Public Records Act and Complaint for Declaratory and Preliminary and Permanent Injunction - (Signed)) filed by The Board of Trustees of the California State University. Filed By: The Board of Trustees of the California State University (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJudgment ((Signed)) filed by The Board of Trustees of the California State University. Refers to: Voice of San Diego Filed By: The Board of Trustees of the California State University (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketJudgment was entered as follows: Judgment entered for The Board of Trustees of the California State University and against Voice of San Diego for $ 0.00, punitive damages: $ 0.00, attorney fees: $ 0.00, interest: $ 0.00, prejudgment costs: $ 0.00, other costs: $ 0.00, amount payable to court: $ .00, for a grand total of $ 0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence (Correspondence Re: Proposed Judgment and Proposed Order) filed by The Board of Trustees of the California State University. Filed By: The Board of Trustees of the California State University (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMiscellaneous Minute Order Finalized.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (Minutes Only) SD generated.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Lodgment (Re: Documents Submitted Conditionally Under Seal - Binder 1) filed by The Board of Trustees of the California State University. Filed By: The Board of Trustees of the California State University (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Lodgment (Re: Documents Submitted Conditionally Under Seal - Binder 2) filed by The Board of Trustees of the California State University. Filed By: The Board of Trustees of the California State University (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Voice of San Diego. Refers to: San Diego State University Filed By: Voice of San Diego (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 07/26/2019 at 10:00:00 AM at Central in C-74 Ronald L. Styn.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 7]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket[Another document for ROA# 7]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-filing transaction partially accepted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint (and Writ of Mandate) filed by Voice of San Diego. Refers to: San Diego State University Filed By: Voice of San Diego (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Voice of San Diego. Refers to: San Diego State University Filed By: Voice of San Diego (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Voice of San Diego. Refers to: San Diego State University Filed By: Voice of San Diego (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Styn, Ronald.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where San Diego State University is a litigant

Latest cases where Voice of San Diego is a litigant

Latest cases where Board of Trustees of The California State University is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anthony Paul O'Brien