This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 04/17/2020 at 03:49:58 (UTC).

Voage vs John Doe Device Manufacturer

Case Summary

On 02/13/2020 Voage filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against John Doe Device Manufacturer. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Randa Trapp. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    02/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Diego County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Randa Trapp

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Voage, Kevin

Defendants

Alvarado Hospital LLC

Shpaner, Dr Alexander

Soumekh, Dr Massoud

Reddy, Dr Anantharan

Weeks, Dr Brian

John Doe Device Manufacturer

 

Court Documents

Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Court Fee Waiver (GRANTED) filed by Voage, Kevin.

Order on Court Fee Waiver

Order on Court Fee Waiver (ADDITIONAL - GRANTED IN PART) filed by Voage, Kevin.

Complaint

Complaint filed by Voage, Kevin. Refers to: John Doe Device Manufacturer; Alvarado Hospital LLC; Soumekh, Dr Massoud; Weeks, Dr Brian; Reddy, Dr Anantharan; Shpaner, Dr Alexander

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Voage, Kevin. Refers to: John Doe Device Manufacturer; Alvarado Hospital LLC; Soumekh, Dr Massoud; Weeks, Dr Brian; Reddy, Dr Anantharan; Shpaner, Dr Alexander

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 6]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/21/2020
  • HearingLocation: C-70; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (GRANTED) filed by Voage, Kevin. Filed By: Voage, Kevin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (ADDITIONAL - GRANTED IN PART) filed by Voage, Kevin. Filed By: Voage, Kevin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/21/2020 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-70 Randa Trapp.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Voage, Kevin. Refers to: John Doe Device Manufacturer; Alvarado Hospital LLC; Soumekh, Dr Massoud; Weeks, Dr Brian; Reddy, Dr Anantharan; Shpaner, Dr Alexander Filed By: Voage, Kevin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Voage, Kevin. Refers to: John Doe Device Manufacturer; Alvarado Hospital LLC; Soumekh, Dr Massoud; Weeks, Dr Brian; Reddy, Dr Anantharan; Shpaner, Dr Alexander Filed By: Voage, Kevin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees filed by Voage, Kevin. Filed By: Voage, Kevin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Trapp, Randa.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Additional Court Fees filed by Voage, Kevin. Filed By: Voage, Kevin (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.