This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 05/23/2022 at 08:09:18 (UTC).

Vivint Solar Developer LLC vs Santos

Case Summary

On 02/22/2022 Vivint Solar Developer LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Santos. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Earl H. Maas, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************L-NC

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Earl H. Maas, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vivint Solar Developer LLC

Defendant

Santos, Esau

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Locke, Wendy A

Attorney at ALDRIDGE PITE LLP

4375 Jutland Drive 200

San Diego, CA 92117-0935

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Collections SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Vivint Solar Developer LLC. Refers to: Santos, Esau

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Vivint Solar Developer LLC. Refers to: Santos, Esau

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Vivint Solar Developer LLC. Refers to: Santos, Esau

Proof of Service

Proof of Service filed by Vivint Solar Developer LLC.

Request for Entry of Default

Request for Entry of Default filed by Vivint Solar Developer LLC. Refers to: Santos, Esau

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/12/2022
  • HearingLocation: N-28; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default filed by Vivint Solar Developer LLC. Refers to: Santos, Esau; Filed By: Vivint Solar Developer LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketThe default filed by Vivint Solar Developer LLC was entered as to Santos, Esau on Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 . Override feature used.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Vivint Solar Developer LLC.; Filed By: Vivint Solar Developer LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 08/12/2022 at 10:00:00 AM at North County in N-28 Earl H. Maas.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Maas, Earl.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Vivint Solar Developer LLC. Refers to: Santos, Esau; Filed By: Vivint Solar Developer LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Vivint Solar Developer LLC. Refers to: Santos, Esau; Filed By: Vivint Solar Developer LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Vivint Solar Developer LLC. Refers to: Santos, Esau; Filed By: Vivint Solar Developer LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vivint Solar Developer LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Locke, Wendy A