This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 09/24/2022 at 09:02:36 (UTC).

Vivint Solar Developer LLC vs Mckelvey

Case Summary

On 05/27/2022 Vivint Solar Developer LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Mckelvey. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, San Diego North County Regional Center located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Blaine K. Bowman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********************C-NC

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Blaine K. Bowman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Vivint Solar Developer LLC

Defendant

McKelvey, Francene

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Locke, Wendy A

Attorney at ALDRIDGE PITE LLP

4375 Jutland Drive 200

San Diego, CA 92117-0935

 

Court Documents

Verified Complaint for Possession of Personal Property; Breach of Express Contract and Common Counts

Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Vivint Solar Developer LLC. Refers to: McKelvey, Francene

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Vivint Solar Developer LLC. Refers to: McKelvey, Francene

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Vivint Solar Developer LLC. Refers to: McKelvey, Francene

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

Case initiation form printed.

Proof of Service (Proof of Service - General)

Proof of Service filed by Vivint Solar Developer LLC.

Notice to Filing Party SD

Answer submitted by McKelvey, Francene rejected on 07/22/2022.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2022
  • HearingLocation: N-31; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer submitted by McKelvey, Francene rejected on 07/22/2022.; Filed By: McKelvey, Francene (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service filed by Vivint Solar Developer LLC.; Filed By: Vivint Solar Developer LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 11/04/2022 at 09:00:00 AM at North County in N-31 Blaine K. Bowman.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Bowman, Blaine.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Vivint Solar Developer LLC. Refers to: McKelvey, Francene; Filed By: Vivint Solar Developer LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Vivint Solar Developer LLC. Refers to: McKelvey, Francene; Filed By: Vivint Solar Developer LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint Demanding More than $10,000 but less than $25,000 filed by Vivint Solar Developer LLC. Refers to: McKelvey, Francene; Filed By: Vivint Solar Developer LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vivint Solar Developer LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Locke, Wendy A