This case was last updated from San Diego County Superior Courts on 09/09/2021 at 01:43:43 (UTC).

Villalobos vs South West Sun Solar Inc

Case Summary

On 08/12/2021 Villalobos filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against South West Sun Solar Inc. This case was filed in San Diego County Superior Courts, Central Courthouse located in San Diego, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard S. Whitney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CTL

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    San Diego, California

Judge Details

Judge

Richard S. Whitney

 

Party Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff

Villalobos, Antonio

Cross Defendants and Defendants

South West Sun Solar Inc

The Western Surety Company

WESTERN SURETY COMPANY; ESA : The Western Surety Company

Villalobos, Antonio

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

WESTERN SURETY COMPANY; ESA : The Western Surety Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Defendant and Plaintiff Attorney

Cardona Loya II, Octavio

Attorney at GOLDEN & CARDONA LOYA LLP

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

Sosa, Carlos E.

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF HAUSMAN & SOSA LLP

 

Court Documents

Notice to Litigants SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

[Another document for ROA# 8]

Stipulation to Alternative Dispute Resolution Process SD

Case initiation form printed.

Notice to Litigants SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Notice of Case Assignment SD

[Another document for ROA# 7]

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by Villalobos, Antonio. Refers to: South West Sun Solar Inc; The Western Surety Company

Civil Case Cover Sheet

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Villalobos, Antonio. Refers to: South West Sun Solar Inc; The Western Surety Company

Complaint

Complaint filed by Villalobos, Antonio. Refers to: South West Sun Solar Inc; The Western Surety Company

Proof of Personal Service - Petition

Proof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Villalobos, Antonio. Refers to: The Western Surety Company

Cross-Complaint

Cross-Complaint filed by WESTERN SURETY COMPANY. Refers to: South West Sun Solar Inc; Villalobos, Antonio

Original Summons

Original Summons filed by WESTERN SURETY COMPANY.

General Denial of Western

General Denial filed by WESTERN SURETY COMPANY.

ANTONIO VILLALOBOS ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FOR INTERPLEADER

Answer filed by Villalobos, Antonio.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2022
  • HearingLocation: C-68; Event Type: Civil Case Management Conference - Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer filed by Villalobos, Antonio. Filed By: Villalobos, Antonio (Cross - Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Denial filed by WESTERN SURETY COMPANY. Filed By: WESTERN SURETY COMPANY (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by WESTERN SURETY COMPANY. Filed By: WESTERN SURETY COMPANY (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCross-Complaint filed by WESTERN SURETY COMPANY. Refers to: South West Sun Solar Inc; Villalobos, Antonio Filed By: WESTERN SURETY COMPANY (Cross - Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Personal Service - Petition filed by Villalobos, Antonio. Refers to: WESTERN SURETY COMPANY Filed By: Villalobos, Antonio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketSummons issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Management Conference scheduled for 02/04/2022 at 09:30:00 AM at Central in C-68 Richard S. Whitney.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCase initiation form printed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint filed by Villalobos, Antonio. Refers to: South West Sun Solar Inc; WESTERN SURETY COMPANY Filed By: Villalobos, Antonio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed by Villalobos, Antonio. Refers to: South West Sun Solar Inc; WESTERN SURETY COMPANY Filed By: Villalobos, Antonio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOriginal Summons filed by Villalobos, Antonio. Refers to: South West Sun Solar Inc; WESTERN SURETY COMPANY Filed By: Villalobos, Antonio (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judicial Officer Whitney, Richard.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTH WEST SUN SOLAR INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Western Surety Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SOSA, CARLOS E